Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:24-bk-31559

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Bankruptcy Jud Stacey G Jernigan
Case #: 3:25-ap-03043
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Good Leap LLC
8781 Sierra College Blvd
Roseville, CA 95661
Represented By
Good Leap LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Scurlark
1321 Walter Drive
Dallas, TX 75211
Represented By
Guy H. Holman
Guy Harvey Holman, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
5 5 notice Debtor Electronic Noticing (DeBN) Mon 04/14 10:22 AM
Debtor's Request to Begin Debtor Electronic Noticing filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth Scurlark . (Blanco, J.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
4 4 order Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding Wed 04/02 2:36 PM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call Related [+]. Trial Docket Call date set for 9/8/2025 at 01:30 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/jerniga. Trial will be held during the week of 9/15/2025. Entered on 4/2/2025 (Edmond, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth Scurlark
3 3 court Summons issued Wed 04/02 2:34 PM
Summons issued on Good Leap LLC., Answer Due 5/2/2025, (Edmond, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
2 2 court Clerk's correspondence Tue 04/01 4:40 PM
INCORRECT ENTRY. Clerk's correspondence requesting Amended Adversary Coversheet from attorney for plaintiff. Related [+] Responses due by 4/11/2025. (Wright Jr., Timothy)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 25-03043 Complaint by Elizabeth Scurlark against Good Leap LLC, CT Corporation. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Cover Sheet # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D). Nature(s) of suit: 91 (Declaratory judgment). 72 (Injunctive relief - other). filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth Scurlark
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/01 12:23 PM
Adversary case 25-03043 Complaint by Elizabeth Scurlark against Good Leap LLC, CT Corporation. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 91 (Declaratory judgment). 72 (Injunctive relief - other). (Holman, Guy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Att: 4 Exhibit C
Att: 5 Exhibit D