New York Southern District Court
Judge:Paul A Engelmayer
Case #: 1:25-cv-02700
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 01, 2025 3:10 PM EDT
Defendant
Senior Official JOHN ARMSTRONG
Defendant
Consul General BRIAN HEATH
Plaintiff
SARAH MUHAMMAD ALBURAKEH
Represented By
Mustapha Lakpene Ndanusa
Davis Ndanusa Ikhlas & Saleem LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/06 1:48 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leslie A. Ramirez-Fisher on behalf of John Armstrong, Brian Heath..(Ramirez-Fisher, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Mon 04/07 3:41 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus served. John Armstrong served on 4/4/2025, answer due 6/3/2025; Brian Heath served on 4/4/2025, answer due 6/3/2025. Service was made by First Class, Certified Mail. Document filed by Sarah Muhammad Alburakeh..(Saleem, Mohammad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 04/03 3:30 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Armstrong, Brian Heath. (sj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 04/02 4:57 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John Armstrong, Brian Heath, Brian Heath c/o Pamela Bondi, Brian Heath c/o Matthew Podolsky, re:1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by Sarah Muhammad Alburakeh..(Ndanusa, Mustapha)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 04/02 4:52 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ndanusa, Mustapha)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Wed 04/02 12:05 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Mustapha Lakpene Ndanusa to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the Basis of Jurisdiction code was not selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated December 4, 2024. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated December 4, 2024 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-cover-sheet-2.. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Wed 04/02 12:06 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Mustapha Lakpene Ndanusa. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: SARAH MUHAMMAD ALBURAKEH; BRIAN HEATH; JOHN ARMSTRONG. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 04/02 12:07 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 04/02 12:09 PM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 04/02 12:09 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 04/02 12:12 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Mustapha Lakpene Ndanusa to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Court name not reflected on PDF; party name/names listed on the ECF docket text and the attached rider is not a party of record;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/01 2:24 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John Armstrong, Brian Heath, Pamela Bondi c/o Brian Heath, Matthew Podolsky c/o Brian Heath, re:1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by SARAH MUHAMMAD ALBURAKEH..(Ndanusa, Mustapha)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 04/01 2:22 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ndanusa, Mustapha)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus Tue 04/01 2:19 PM
COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against JOHN ARMSTRONG, BRIAN HEATH (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-30860696).Document filed by SARAH MUHAMMAD ALBURAKEH..(Ndanusa, Mustapha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - K