New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jennifer H Rearden
Referred: Stewart D Aaron
Case #: 1:25-cv-02707
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 01, 2025 4:07 PM EDT
Defendant
New York Adorned Brooklyn Incorporated
Plaintiff
Luis Mercedes
Represented By
Rami Salim
Stein Saks PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, April 18, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 04/18 10:16 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. New York Adorned Brooklyn Incorporated served on 4/17/2025, answer due 5/8/2025. Service was accepted by Dave Doe. Document filed by Luis Mercedes..(Salim, Rami)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
6 6 2 pgs order Order Thu 04/03 5:09 PM
ORDER Plaintiff alleges that Defendants website is not accessible to blind and visually impaired customers and, thus, violates Title III of the Americans with Disabilities Act ("ADA"), 42 U.S.C. § 12181 et seq. By separate Order today, the Court is referring this case to the designatedMagistrate Judge for General Pretrial Purposes, including settlement. In addition, in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, to conserve resources, and to promote judicial efficiency, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), to conducting all furtherproceedings before the designated Magistrate Judge.If the parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for the Defendantmust, within two weeks of the date on which Defendant enters an appearance, file on ECF afully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form(available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf). The executed formshould be filed using the Proposed Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge filing eventin accordance with ECF Rule 13.27. If the Court approves that form, then all furtherproceedings will be conducted before the designated Magistrate Judge. If either party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before thedesignated Magistrate Judge, then the parties must file a joint letter, within two weeks of thedate on which Defendant enters an appearance, informing the Court that the parties do notconsent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. Theparties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 4/3/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 04/03 5:07 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 4/3/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 04/03 3:55 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York Adorned Brooklyn Incorporated. (sj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 04/02 10:33 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NEW YORK ADORNED BROOKLYN INCORPORATED, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Luis Mercedes..(Salim, Rami)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 04/02 10:09 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 04/02 10:09 AM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 04/02 10:09 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 04/01 3:19 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Salim, Rami)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/01 3:18 PM
COMPLAINT against New York Adorned Brooklyn Incorporated. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30861533)Document filed by Luis Mercedes..(Salim, Rami)
Related: [-]