New York Southern District Court
Judge:Richard M Berman
Case #: 1:25-cv-02708
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 01, 2025 4:07 PM EDT
Defendant
DDC Enterprise Limited
Defendant
DDC US INC
Defendant
Yai's Thai, Inc.
Plaintiff
Leland Copenhagen
Represented By
Joshua Burger
Bernstein, Shur, Sawyer & Nelson
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 05/05 3:00 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Yai's Thai, Inc. waiver sent on 4/29/2025, answer due 6/30/2025. Document filed by Leland Copenhagen..(Burger, Joshua)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 05/05 2:59 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. DDC US Inc. waiver sent on 4/29/2025, answer due 6/30/2025. Document filed by Leland Copenhagen..(Burger, Joshua)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 05/05 2:57 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. DDC Enterprise Limited waiver sent on 4/29/2025, answer due 6/30/2025. Document filed by Leland Copenhagen..(Burger, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
10 10 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Thu 04/03 1:05 PM
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 5/13/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard M. Berman. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 4/3/2025) (ks)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
9 9 service Summons Issued Wed 04/02 3:58 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to DDC Enterprise Limited..(pc)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued Wed 04/02 3:57 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Yai's Thai, Inc...(pc)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 04/02 3:57 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to DDC US Inc...(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 04/02 11:25 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Richard M. Berman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 04/02 11:25 AM
Magistrate Judge Henry J. Ricardo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 04/02 11:26 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Wed 04/02 11:26 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joshua Burger. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: DDC US INC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Wed 04/02 11:26 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joshua Burger. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $235,000,000; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/01 3:50 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Yai's Thai, Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Leland Copenhagen..(Burger, Joshua)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/01 3:49 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DDC US INC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Leland Copenhagen..(Burger, Joshua)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/01 3:48 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DDC Enterprise Limited, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Leland Copenhagen..(Burger, Joshua)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/01 3:45 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Leland Copenhagen..(Burger, Joshua)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 04/01 3:42 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Burger, Joshua)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/01 3:34 PM
COMPLAINT against DDC Enterprise Limited, DDC US INC, Yai's Thai, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30861668)Document filed by Leland Copenhagen..(Burger, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Merger Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Employment Agreement