California Northern District Court
Judge:Noel Wise
Referred: Virginia K Demarchi
Case #: 5:25-cv-02988
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 01, 2025 2:10 PM PDT
Defendant
Apple, Inc.
Plaintiff
Jennifer Morehouse
Represented By
Kyle Douglas McLean
Siri & Glimstad LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Keri Smith
Represented By
Kyle Douglas McLean
Siri & Glimstad LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Wed 05/07 1:42 PM
NOTICE of Change in Counsel: Attorney Kyle McLean no longer representing Jennifer Morehouse, Keri Smith in this case (Connett, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
19 19 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 05/05 5:49 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jennifer Morehouse, Keri Smith.. (McLean, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
18 18 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 04/25 1:50 PM
ORDER granting as modified 15 Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint and to Set Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss signed by Judge Noel Wise. (akw, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
17 17 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/23 3:25 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned using a proportionate, random and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to District Judge Noel Wise. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
16 16 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Wed 04/23 2:33 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND WILL BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 04/23 1:09 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Complaint and to Set Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss filed by Apple, Inc..(Chorba, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Wesley Sze
14 14 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 04/23 1:03 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple, Inc... (Chorba, Christopher)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 04/23 1:00 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple, Inc. (Chorba, Christopher)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 04/23 12:56 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple, Inc. (Chorba, Christopher)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Wed 04/23 12:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Wesley Sze on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Sze, Wesley)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Wed 04/23 12:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Lauren Margaret Blas on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Blas, Lauren)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Wed 04/23 12:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Christopher Chorba on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Chorba, Christopher)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Discovery Wed 04/23 3:25 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi for Discovery. (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Mon 04/21 5:34 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 5/5/2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/16 6:59 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Morehouse, Keri Smith. Apple, Inc. served on 4/7/2025, answer due 4/28/2025. (McLean, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 04/03 6:57 PM
Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc.. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 04/03 6:54 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/25/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/2/2025 10:00 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 04/02 10:42 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/16/2025. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 04/01 5:31 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by Jennifer Morehouse, Keri Smith . (McLean, Kyle)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Tue 04/01 2:05 PM
Proposed Summons. (McLean, Kyle)
Related: [-]
1 1 35 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/01 2:04 PM
COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20519051.). Filed by Jennifer Morehouse, Keri Smith.(McLean, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of K. McLean,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Electronic Filing Error Tue 04/01 2:42 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. Use December 2024 form which can be downloaded from https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetPlease re-file in its entirety. Re:1 Complaint filed by Keri Smith, Jennifer Morehouse (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]