New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elizabeth S Stong
Case #: 1:25-bk-41607
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Zoya AB Management, LLC
355 Kings Hwy Apt 5F
Brooklyn, NY 11223-1584
Represented By
Alla Kachan
Law Offices Of Alla Kachan P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn) Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green Room 510
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Thu 04/10 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Notice Date 04/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 05, 2025
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sun 04/06 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 04/05/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
7 7 order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference (Ch 11) All Judges Mon 04/07 9:32 AM
Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference . Signed on 4/4/2025. Status hearing to be held on 5/22/2025 at 12:30 PM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (drk)
Related: [-]
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Sat 04/05 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 04/04/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
4 4 trustee Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 - US Trustee Thu 04/03 9:18 AM
Meeting of Creditors Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/12/2025 at 03:30 PM at Telephonic Meeting: Phone 1 (877) 953-2748, Participant Code 3415538, Enter # sign. (Scott, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
3 3 court Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Wed 04/02 10:54 AM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 4/1/2025. Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 4/1/2025. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 4/1/2025. Small Business Balance Sheet due by 4/8/2025. Small Business Cash Flow Statement due by 4/8/2025. Small Business Statement of Operations due by 4/8/2025. Small Business Tax Return due by 4/8/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 4/15/2025. (drk)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Pre-Petition Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y LBR 2017-1 Tue 04/01 5:19 PM
Pre-Petition Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y LBR 2017-1 Filed by Alla Kachan on behalf of Zoya AB Management, LLC (Kachan, Alla)
Related: [-]
1 1 30+ pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 04/01 5:18 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Small Business Non-Individual. Fee Amount $ 1738. Filed by Alla Kachan on behalf of Zoya AB Management, LLC Chapter 11 Plan - Small Business - due by 09/29/2025. Chapter 11 Small Business Disclosure Statement due by 09/29/2025. (Kachan, Alla)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Tue 04/01 5:20 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:1 25-41607 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A23486218. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1