Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alan D Albright
Referred: Mark Lane
Case #: 1:25-cv-00492
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 01, 2025 6:06 PM CDT
Defendant
Mark Chapla
Defendant
Natasha Chapla
Defendant
Tri-City Towing, LLC
Plaintiff
John K. Simmons
Represented By
Charles L. Scalise
Ross & Scalise, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
12 12 order Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Tue 05/13 4:12 PM
Docket Control Order Pursuant to Rules 16(b) and 26(f) with Appendix A - Joint Proposed Scheduling Order attached. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/11/2025 . Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (cnr)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
11 11 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 05/12 3:33 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to2 Amended Complaint . Attorney Veronica Hunter added to party Mark Chapla(pty:dft), Attorney Veronica Hunter added to party Natasha Chapla(pty:dft), Attorney Veronica Hunter added to party Tri-City Towing, LLC(pty:dft) by Mark Chapla, Natasha Chapla, Tri-City Towing, LLC.(Hunter, Veronica)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/08 5:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by John K. Simmons. Mark Chapla served on 4/5/2025, answer due 4/28/2025. (Scalise, Charles)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/08 5:11 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by John K. Simmons. Tri-City Towing, LLC served on 4/8/2025, answer due 4/29/2025. (Scalise, Charles)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/08 5:08 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by John K. Simmons. Natasha Chapla served on 4/5/2025, answer due 4/28/2025. (Scalise, Charles)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 04/07 12:58 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by John K. Simmons. Mark Chapla served on 4/5/2025, answer due 4/28/2025. (Scalise, Charles)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 04/02 1:20 PM
Summons Issued as to Mark Chapla, Natasha Chapla, Tri-City Towing, LLC. (kp)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Certificate of Interested Parties Wed 04/02 10:24 AM
Certificate of Interested Parties by John K. Simmons. (Scalise, Charles)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 04/02 10:07 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by John K. Simmons. (Scalise, Charles)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 04/02 9:44 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants amending1 Complaint., filed by John K. Simmons.(Scalise, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 04/02 1:19 PM
STANDING ORDER (dated 02 27-2025 REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (kp)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/01 5:08 PM
COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19988173). No Summons requested at this time, filed by John K. Simmons.(Scalise, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/02 1:17 PM
Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Wed 04/02 1:18 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Wed 04/02 1:18 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by John K. Simmons. (kp)
Related: [-]