California Southern District Court
Judge:James E Simmons, Jr
Referred: Barbara Lynn Major
Case #: 3:25-cv-00786
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 01, 2025 5:05 PM PDT
Defendant
TrueCare Property Holdings, LLC
Plaintiff
Amy Wright
Represented By
Daniel Guinn Shay
Shay Legal, Apc
contact info
Joshua Brandon Swigart
Swigart Law Group, Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/22 7:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Teresa Regina Morin on behalf of TrueCare Property Holdings, LLC (Morin, Teresa)Attorney Teresa Regina Morin added to party TrueCare Property Holdings, LLC(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/22 7:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sam Hyams-Millard on behalf of TrueCare Property Holdings, LLC (Hyams-Millard, Sam)Attorney Sam Hyams-Millard added to party TrueCare Property Holdings, LLC(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/22 6:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anne-Marie D. Dao on behalf of TrueCare Property Holdings, LLC (Dao, Anne-Marie)Attorney Anne-Marie D. Dao added to party TrueCare Property Holdings, LLC(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/22 6:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew W. Holder on behalf of TrueCare Property Holdings, LLC (Holder, Matthew)Attorney Matthew W. Holder added to party TrueCare Property Holdings, LLC(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 04/21 10:30 AM
ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint. TrueCare Property Holdings, LLC answer due 6/30/2025. Signed by District Judge James E. Simmons, Jr on 4/21/2025. (maq)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 04/18 4:59 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by TrueCare Property Holdings, LLC identifying Other Affiliate North County Health Project, Inc. for TrueCare Property Holdings, LLC.. (Deagle, Wynter)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Fri 04/18 4:56 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by TrueCare Property Holdings, LLC identifying Plaintiff Amy Wright and Defendant TruCare Property Holdings, LLC . Identifying Other Affiliate North County Health Project, Inc. for TrueCare Property Holdings, LLC. (Deagle, Wynter)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 04/18 4:42 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, including any motion to dismiss, by TrueCare Property Holdings, LLC. (Deagle, Wynter)Attorney Wynter L. Deagle added to party TrueCare Property Holdings, LLC(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/10 4:35 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amy Wright. TrueCare Property Holdings, LLC served. (Shay, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 04/01 3:53 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (yxc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/01 3:51 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against TrueCare Property Holdings, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-19754959.), filed by Amy Wright. The new case number is 3:25-cv-786-JES-BLM. Judge James E. Simmons, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Swigart, Joshua)(yxc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet