Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Mary S Scriven
Referred: Christopher P Tuite
Case #: 8:25-cv-00806
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 02, 2025 1:06 AM EDT
Defendant
KEVIN J BONACUM
2433 Triggerfish Court
Holiday, FL 34691
Defendant
CONNELLY AND ASSOICATES, INC
1513 Tilco Drive
Frederick, MD 21704
Plaintiff
PREFERRED DRILLING SOLUTIONS, INC
8820 66th St N
Pinellas Park, FL 33782
Represented By
Jesse Philippe
Jphilippe, Llc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
18 18 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 04/23 10:32 AM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 14 Defendant Connelly and Associates, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall file an answer or other response to the Complaint on or before May 16, 2025. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/23/2025. (AC)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of a Related Action Wed 04/23 5:56 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Connelly and Assoicates, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Berger, Evan)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 04/23 5:44 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Evan Benjamin Berger on behalf of Connelly and Assoicates, Inc. Lead Counsel: Evan Benjamin Berger. (Berger, Evan) Modified to remove extra period on 4/23/2025 (AA)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Wed 04/23 5:42 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Connelly and Assoicates, Inc.. (Berger, Evan)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Wed 04/23 5:27 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Connelly and Assoicates, Inc. (Berger, Evan) Modified to remove extra period on 4/23/2025 (AA)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of appearance Wed 04/23 5:19 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Evan Benjamin Berger on behalf of Connelly and Assoicates, Inc. (Berger, Evan)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 04/21 3:17 PM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 8 Defendant Kevin J. Bonacum's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall file an answer or other response to the Complaint on or before May 16, 2025. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/21/2025. (AC)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of a Related Action Mon 04/21 3:00 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Kevin J. Bonacum. Related case(s): No (Drushal, Amy)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Mon 04/21 2:58 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Amy Lea Drushal on behalf of Kevin J. Bonacum. Lead Counsel: Amy L. Drushal. (Drushal, Amy)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Mon 04/21 2:57 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Kevin J. Bonacum. (Drushal, Amy)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Mon 04/21 2:06 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Kevin J. Bonacum. (Drushal, Amy)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of appearance Mon 04/21 2:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Lea Drushal on behalf of Kevin J. Bonacum (Drushal, Amy)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 04/04 9:48 AM
NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BCH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 04/02 7:36 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jesse Philippe on behalf of Preferred Drilling Solutions, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Jesse Philippe. (Philippe, Jesse)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons issued Wed 04/02 4:03 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Kevin J. Bonacum, Connelly and Assoicates, Inc. (AM)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 04/02 3:58 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jesse Philippe of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AM)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/02 9:55 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:25-cv-00806-MSS-CPT. (JOS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
1 1 21 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/01 10:26 PM
COMPLAINT Against ALL Defendants against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-23196652) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Philippe, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Summon Bonacum,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Summon Connelly,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Expansion Ads,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Employment Contract Bonacum