New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Shipp
Referred: Justin T Quinn
Case #: 3:25-cv-02178
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2025
Terminated:Apr 22, 2025
Case in other court:SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, MIDDLESEX COUNTY, MID L 001181 25
Last checked: Thursday May 15, 2025 7:06 AM EDT
Defendant
AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC
Represented By
AUGUST W. HECKMAN, III
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JASON MOTA
Represented By
SCOTT ALAN TELSON
Lombardi & Lombardi, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Tue 04/22 11:15 AM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 6/23/2025. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 4/22/2025. (jab)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
6 6 misc Letter Mon 04/21 5:27 PM
Letter from August W. Heckman III, Esq. to Judge Shipp re resolution of matter. (HECKMAN, AUGUST)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 04/01 12:30 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/21/2025. (dmr3)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
5 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (HECKMAN, AUGUST)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE of Appearance by AUGUST W. HECKMAN, III on behalf of AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC (HECKMAN, AUGUST)
Related: [-]
3 3 Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC. (HECKMAN, AUGUST)
Related: [-]
2 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC identifying Amazon.com Services LLC as Corporate Parent.. (HECKMAN, AUGUST)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, MIDDLESEX COUNTY, case number MID-L-001181-25. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number BNJDC-16132892), filed by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, LLC.(HECKMAN, AUGUST)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 04/01 12:29 PM
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Justin T. Quinn added. (dmr3)
Related: [-]