South Carolina District Court
Judge:Donald C Coggins, Jr
Referred: Kevin Mcdonald
Case #: 7:25-cv-02691
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 02, 2025 1:14 AM EDT
Defendant
The Gannett, Inc
Defendant
Charles Wright
Plaintiff
Tina Lindsey
130 Stringer Road
Landrum, SC 29356


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
10 10 misc Document Mailed Wed 04/23 10:58 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION,8 Order placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Tina Lindsey, 130 Stringer Road, Landrum, SC 29356. (agig)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Report and Recommendation Wed 04/23 10:56 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 6 Amended Complaint, filed by Tina Lindsey. It is recommended that the district court dismiss this action with prejudice, without leave to amend, and without issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 5/7/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 4/23/25. (agig)
Related: [-]
8 8 3 pgs order Order - No Service - Non Inmate Wed 04/23 10:49 AM
ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 4/23/25. (agig)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 04/21 9:43 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Gannett, Inc, Charles Wright, filed by Tina Lindsey. Service due by 7/17/2025. (agig)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/01 3:27 PM
COMPLAINT against The Gannett, Inc, Charles Wright ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 600010441), filed by Tina Lindsey. Service due by 6/30/2025. (agig)
Related: [-]