California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Martin R Barash
Case #: 1:25-bk-10520
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 07, 2025

Debtor
D.R.E.A.M. Clothing, LLC
9601 Owensmouth Ave # No
Chatsworth, CA 91311-4812
Represented By
Eileen Keusseyan
Keosian Law LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Jeremy W. Faith (TR)
16030 Ventura Blvd., Suite 470
Encino, CA 91436
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 04/02/2025 12:02 AM PDT
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 04/01 5:31 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:1:25-bk-10520] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58235993. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Tue 04/01 5:27 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by D.R.E.A.M. Clothing, LLC Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 04/15/2025. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 04/15/2025. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 04/15/2025. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 04/15/2025. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 04/15/2025. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 04/15/2025. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 04/15/2025. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 04/15/2025. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 04/15/2025. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 04/15/2025. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 04/15/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 04/15/2025. Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122A-1) Due: 04/15/2025. Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 04/15/2025. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 04/15/2025. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 04/15/2025. Attorney Disclosure of Compensation Arrangement in Individual Chapter 7 Case (LBR Form F2090-1) due 04/15/2025. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 04/15/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 04/15/2025. (Keusseyan, Eileen)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Tue 04/01 7:04 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Faith (TR), Jeremy W. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/7/2025 at 09:30 AM via Zoom - Faith: Meeting ID 973 812 7924, Passcode 8746194099, Phone 1 747 281 2473. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]