California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Barry Russell
Case #: 2:25-bk-12717
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 05, 2025

Debtor
Moroni Inc.
14321 Bonelli St
City of Industry, CA 91746-3019
Represented By
Maria W Tam
Law Office Of Maria W. Tam
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Peter J Mastan (TR)
550 S Hope Street, Suite 1765
Los Angeles, CA 90071
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 04/02/2025 12:03 AM PDT
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Tue 04/01 9:40 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Moroni Inc. (Tam, Maria)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Tue 04/01 10:04 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Mastan (TR), Peter J with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/5/2025 at 11:00 AM via Zoom - Mastan: Meeting ID 524 459 8731, Passcode 3158479849, Phone 1 213 833 9323. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]