Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00495
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 02, 2025 12:19 AM MST
Defendant
Javier Serrano-Gonzalez (1)
Represented By
Michael S Reeves
Law Office Of Michael S Reeves
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Megan Kelly
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/02/2025 12:59 AM MST
Friday, February 21, 2025
Arrest of Javier Serrano-Gonzalez on 2/21/2025. (MRH) [2:25-mj-05115-DMF]
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 23, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Javier Serrano-Gonzalez. (MRH) [2:25-mj-05115-DMF]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: Megan Kelly appearing for USA. Attorney Stuart James Zander terminated . (Kelly, Megan) [2:25-mj-05115-DMF]
Related: [-]
4 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by Javier Serrano-Gonzalez. Related [+] [2:25-mj-05115-DMF]
Related: [-] eves, Michael
5 5 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle: Initial Appearance as to Javier Serrano-Gonzalez held on 2/24/2025. DEFENDANT SWORN AS TO FINANCIAL STATUS. Appointing CJA Attorney Michael S Reeves for Defendant. Detention Hearing submitted. Defendant ordered detained pending trial as a flight risk. Preliminary Hearing waived. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. SPANISH Interpreter required for Defendant. As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all information required by Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, and contempt proceedings. Appearances : AUSA Abbie Broughton for Stuart Zander for the Government, CJA Attorney Michael Reeves for Defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Matthew Ren assists Defendant. Related [+] Hearing held 2:53 PM to 2:56 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (AO) [2:25-mj-05115-DMF]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART
6 6 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is ordered to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant(s), that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant(s) or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle.(AO)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [2:25-mj-05115-DMF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
7 7 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Javier Serrano-Gonzalez: The Court concludes that the following facts require the detention of the Defendant pending trial in this case. Findings of Fact and Statement of Reasons: (1) There is probable cause to believe that the Defendant has committed an offense. (2) There is a serious risk that the Defendant will not appear. (3) Defendant is a citizen of another country, illegally in the United States of America. (4) Defendant does not have sufficient ties to the community. (5) The reports from Pretrial Services Agency are adopted as the further findings of this Magistrate Judge. Conclusions of Law: (1) There is a serious risk that the defendant will flee. (2) No condition or combination of conditions will reasonably assure the appearance of the Defendant as required. Directions Regarding Detention: The Defendant is committed to the custody of the Attorney General or his designated representative for confinement in a corrections facility separate, to the extent practicable, from persons awaiting or serving sentences or being held in custody pending appeal. The defendant shall be afforded a reasonable opportunity for private consultation with defense counsel. On order of a court of the United States or on request of an attorney for the Government, the person in charge of the corrections facility shall deliver the Defendant to the United States Marshal for the purpose of an appearance in connection with a court proceeding. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 2/24/2025. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (AO) [2:25-mj-05115-DMF]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER granting4 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Javier Serrano-Gonzalez (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 2/25/25. (rkt) [2:25-mj-05115-DMF]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
9 9 INFORMATION - Felony as to Javier Serrano-Gonzalez (1) count(s) 1, 2. (SPW)
Related: [-]
10 10 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Javier Serrano-Gonzalez. (SPW)
Related: [-]
11 11 DOJ CONFLICT MEMO. No probable conflict re Judge Krissa M. Lanham. Filed by USA as to Javier Serrano-Gonzalez. (SPW)
Related: [-]
12 12 MINUTE ORDER as to Javier Serrano-Gonzalez. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Deborah M. Fine to set a Plea and Sentence. (SPW)
Related: [-]