Texas Western District Court
Case #: 5:25-mj-00497
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 02, 2025 2:20 AM CDT
Defendant
MIGUEL ANGEL TORRES-SEGURA (1)
Represented By
Duty Pub. Defender-San Antonio
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Juan M. Gonzalez
Law Office Of Juan M. Gonzalez
contact info
David Joseph Kimmelman - FPD
Federal Public Defender-Txw
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Amanda C. Brown
Office Of The U.S. Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/02/2025 3:16 AM CDT
Monday, March 31, 2025
Arrest of MIGUEL ANGEL TORRES-SEGURA (vnd)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer as to MIGUEL ANGEL TORRES-SEGURA. (vnd)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to MIGUEL ANGEL TORRES-SEGURA. (vnd)
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney:Initial Appearance as to MIGUEL ANGEL TORRES-SEGURA held on 3/31/2025. Defendant requests appointment of counsel. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to MIGUEL ANGEL TORRES-SEGURA (vnd)
Related: [-]
4 4 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by MIGUEL ANGEL TORRES-SEGURA (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (vnd)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Duty Pub. Defender-San Antonio for MIGUEL ANGEL TORRES-SEGURA. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (vnd)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: as to MIGUEL ANGEL TORRES-SEGURA (Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 4/3/2025 10:30 AM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney,). Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (vnd)
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David Joseph Kimmelman - FPD appearing for MIGUEL ANGEL TORRES-SEGURA . Attorney David Joseph Kimmelman - FPD added to party MIGUEL ANGEL TORRES-SEGURA(pty:dft) (Kimmelman - FPD, David)
Related: [-]