Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:25-mj-01358
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2025
Terminated:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 02, 2025 2:26 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Duty AUSA-El Paso
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Flor De Maria Sajbin De La Cruz De Boch (1)
Terminated: 03/31/2025
Represented By
Arif Abrar
Abrar And Vergara P.L.L.C
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/02/2025 3:28 AM CDT
Monday, March 31, 2025
Oral Motion to Remit Special Assessment Fee by USA as to Flor De Maria Sajbin De La Cruz De Boch. (epda)
Related: [-]
Oral Order GRANTING [] Motion to Remit Special Assessment Fee as to Flor De Maria Sajbin De La Cruz De Boch (1). Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (epda)
Related: [-]
1 1 Petty Documents as to Flor De Maria Sajbin De La Cruz De Boch (epda)
Related: [-]