Texas Eastern District Court
Case #: 4:25-mj-00064
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2025
Terminated:Mar 12, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 02, 2025 2:18 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Chalana Oliver
Doj-Usao
contact info
Anand Varadarajan
Us Attorney'S Office - Plano
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Phillip Schwartzkopf (1)
Terminated: 03/12/2025
Represented By
Brian George O'Shea
Office Of The Federal Defender - Eastern District (frisco)
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/02/2025 2:57 AM CDT
Monday, March 03, 2025
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Phillip Schwartzkopf (1). (knp)
Related: [-]
3 3 E-GOV SEALED Form AO 257 filed as to Phillip Schwartzkopf (knp)
Related: [-]
4 4 E-GOV SEALED Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Bill Davis in case as to Phillip Schwartzkopf. (knp)
Related: [-]