California Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas S Hixson
Case #: 3:25-cv-02968
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 15, 2025 3:44 AM PDT
Defendant
Bre Westgate Property Owner LLC
Represented By
Cris Campbell Vaughan
Vaughan & Associates Law Office, Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Ahmed Al-kubaisi
Represented By
Matthew Valenti
Valenti Law Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/05 3:43 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Bre Westgate Property Owner LLC. (Vaughan, Cris)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
13 13 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 04/30 4:41 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bre Westgate Property Owner LLC.. (Vaughan, Cris)
Related: [-]
12 12 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Wed 04/30 3:44 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re: ECF No.11 . The consent/declination form is signed by counsel but does not indicate the party/parties in the space under counsel's signature - COUNSEL FOR (OR "PRO SE"). Counsel is directed to file a revised consent/declination form by May 7, 2025 that includes the name(s) of the party/parties counsel represents. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 04/30 1:21 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bre Westgate Property Owner LLC.. (Vaughan, Cris)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 04/14 5:08 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ahmed Al-kubaisi. Bre Westgate Property Owner LLC served on 4/14/2025, answer due 5/5/2025. (Valenti, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 12, 2025
9 9 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Sat 04/12 3:17 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ahmed Al-kubaisi.. (Valenti, Matthew)
Related: [-]
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Sat 04/12 2:37 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re: ECF No.7 . The consent/declination form is signed by counsel but does not indicate the party/parties in the space under counsel's signature - COUNSEL FOR (OR "PRO SE"). Counsel is directed to file a revised consent/declination form by 4/17/2024 that includes the name(s) of the party/parties counsel represents. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 04/02 7:12 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ahmed Al-kubaisi.. (Valenti, Matthew)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 04/02 5:56 PM
Summons Issued as to Bre Westgate Property Owner LLC. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case Wed 04/02 5:54 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 04/01 9:53 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/15/2025. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
3 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ahmed Al-kubaisi re1 Complaint (Valenti, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Valenti, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs COMPLAINT against Bre Westgate Property Owner LLC ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20516229.). Filed by Ahmed Al-kubaisi.(Valenti, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet