Nevada District Court
Judge:Cristina D Silva
Referred: Maximiliano D Couvillier, III
Case #: 2:25-cv-00590
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 02, 2025 1:15 AM PDT
Defendant
TH Foods, Inc.
Plaintiff
Preston House
926 Dancing Vines
Las Vegas, NV 89183


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
22 22 2 pgs order Order Show Cause Wed 05/07 3:14 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. IT IS ORDERED that, other than House's response to this show-cause order, no party may file any other motion until the order to show cause is resolved. Show Cause Response due by 5/30/2025. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 5/7/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
21 21 4 pgs respm Response Mon 05/05 10:52 AM
RESPONSE to19 Motion to Strike by Plaintiff Preston House. Replies due by 5/12/2025. (CAH)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
20 20 6 pgs respm Reply Fri 05/02 2:31 PM
REPLY to Response to11 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendant TH Foods, Inc.. (Gallagher, Kristen)
Related: [-]
19 19 5 pgs motion Motion Strike Fri 05/02 2:24 PM
MOTION to Strike16 Response, by Defendant TH Foods, Inc.. Responses due by 5/16/2025. (Gallagher, Kristen) (dispositive)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
18 18 5 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/01 4:42 PM
ORDER Granting15 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Marcia E. Goodman for TH Foods, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Kristen T. Gallagher. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 5/1/2025. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
17 17 4 pgs order Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session Tue 04/29 9:52 AM
ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 8/15/2025 at 10:00 AM in LV Chambers - Videoconference before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. On August 8, 2025, parties and counsel must send along with their confidential written evaluation statement (see section IV)their preferred e-mail address for the Zoom invitation to judicial clerk Brenna Irving at brenna_irving@nvd.uscourts.gov. Each party's written evaluation must be submitted electronically to judicial clerk Brenna Irving at brenna_irving@nvd.uscourts.gov by 4:00 p.m. on August 8, 2025. The evaluation statement and each exhibit should be emailed as separate attachments within the same e-mail. Do not deliver or mail the written evaluations to the clerk's office and do not serve a copy on opposing counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 4/28/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
16 16 6 pgs respm Response Mon 04/28 10:02 AM
RESPONSE to11 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Preston House. Replies due by 5/2/2025.(CAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit,
Att: 12 Exhibit,
Att: 13 Exhibit
15 15 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Fri 04/25 3:38 PM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Marcia E. Goodman and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Kristen T. Gallagher (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-8032259) by Defendant TH Foods, Inc.. (Gallagher, Kristen)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Minute Order Klingele Fri 04/25 9:19 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 4/25/2025. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to11 Motion to Dismiss,,. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Minute Order Klingele Fri 04/25 9:13 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 4/25/2025. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to11 Motion to Dismiss,,. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
12 12 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 04/24 5:07 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by TH Foods, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Mitsubishi Corporation, Corporate Parent Kameda Seika Co., Ltd. for TH Foods, Inc. added. (Gallagher, Kristen)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Motion Dismiss Thu 04/24 1:07 PM
MOTION to Dismiss5 Complaint by Defendant TH Foods, Inc.. Responses due by 5/8/2025. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/4/2025. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/8/2025.(Gallagher, Kristen) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Monday, April 07, 2025
10 10 3 pgs respm Response Tue 04/08 10:16 AM
RESPONSE to8 Notice of Related Cases by Plaintiff Preston House. (CAH)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/08 10:12 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Preston House re6 Summons Issued. TH Foods, Inc. served on 4/3/2025. (CAH)
Related: [-]
8 8 3 pgs notice Notice Related Cases Mon 04/07 11:35 AM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:24-cv-01326-JAD-DJA by Defendant TH Foods, Inc.. (Gallagher, Kristen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
7 7 3 pgs misc Certificate Interested Parties Wed 04/02 10:37 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Preston House. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (CAH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
6 6 1 pgs service Summons Issued Tue 04/01 4:00 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to TH Foods, Inc. (JG)
Related: [-]
5 5 10 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/01 3:58 PM
COMPLAINT against TH Foods, Inc. (Filing fee $405- receipt No. 200013803) by Preston House. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/11/2025. Proof of service due by 6/30/2025. (JG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
4 4 1 pgs misc Receipt Payment Tue 04/01 3:41 PM
RECEIPT of Payment: $ 405, receipt number 200013803. CLERK'S NOTE: The filing fee has been PAID IN FULL . Any pending IFPs have been terminated. (JG)
Related: [-]
3 3 4 pgs notice Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas Tue 04/01 8:59 AM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (MAM)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice ENE Notice Tue 04/01 8:53 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler will be the evaluating judge in this case. No ENE will be conducted in cases subject to arbitration. Parties to cases subject to mandatory arbitration, as well as parties who agree to arbitrate, must notify the Court of the same no later than 14 days after the date of this Notice. Failure to do so may result in sanctions. (no image attached) (MAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
2 2 misc Receipt Initiating Documents Tue 04/01 8:55 AM
RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (MAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 10 pgs Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Tue 04/01 8:52 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Maximiliano D. Couvillier, III. (MAM)
Related: [-]