Original Case: 1:24-cv-08451

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-01590
Typecivil / private / civil rights
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 02, 2025 4:15 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
STUDENT RESEARCH GROUP
Represented By
Jared K. Levy
Wood Smith Henning & Berman
contact info
Jacqueline Murphy
Wood Smith Henning & Berman
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
HOMEDATA
Represented By
Jared K. Levy
Wood Smith Henning & Berman
contact info
Jacqueline Murphy
Wood Smith Henning & Berman
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
DEEPSYNC LABS
Represented By
Jared K. Levy
Wood Smith Henning & Berman
contact info
Jacqueline Murphy
Wood Smith Henning & Berman
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
COLLEGE BOUND SELECTION SERVICE
Represented By
Jared K. Levy
Wood Smith Henning & Berman
contact info
Jacqueline Murphy
Wood Smith Henning & Berman
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
ASL MARKETING INC
Represented By
Jared K. Levy
Wood Smith Henning & Berman
contact info
Jacqueline Murphy
Wood Smith Henning & Berman
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
ALUMNIFINDER
Represented By
Jared K. Levy
Wood Smith Henning & Berman
contact info
Jacqueline Murphy
Wood Smith Henning & Berman
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
ACCUDATA INTEGRATED MARKETING INC
Represented By
Jared K. Levy
Wood Smith Henning & Berman
contact info
Jacqueline Murphy
Wood Smith Henning & Berman
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
COMPACT INFORMATION SYSTEMS LLC
Represented By
Jared K. Levy
Wood Smith Henning & Berman
contact info
Jacqueline Murphy
Wood Smith Henning & Berman
contact info
Intervenor - Intervenor-appellee
ATTORNEY GENERAL NEW JERSEY
Represented By
Kashif T. Chand
Office of Attorney General of New Jersey
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
WILLIAM SULLIVAN
Represented By
Rajiv D. Parikh
PEM Law
contact info
Kathleen B. Einhorn
PEM Law
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
PETER ANDREYEV
Represented By
Rajiv D. Parikh
PEM Law
contact info
Kathleen B. Einhorn
PEM Law
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
PATRICK COLLIGAN
Represented By
Jessica A. Merejo
PEM Law
contact info
Rajiv D. Parikh
PEM Law
contact info
Kathleen B. Einhorn
PEM Law
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JUSTYNA MALONEY
Represented By
Jessica A. Merejo
PEM Law
contact info
Rajiv D. Parikh
PEM Law
contact info
Kathleen B. Einhorn
PEM Law
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
SCOTT MALONEY
Represented By
Jessica A. Merejo
PEM Law
contact info
Rajiv D. Parikh
PEM Law
contact info
Kathleen B. Einhorn
PEM Law
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
EDWIN MALDONADO
Represented By
Rajiv D. Parikh
PEM Law
contact info
Kathleen B. Einhorn
PEM Law
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JANE DOE 2, a law enforcement officer
Represented By
Jessica A. Merejo
PEM Law
contact info
Rajiv D. Parikh
PEM Law
contact info
Kathleen B. Einhorn
PEM Law
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JANE DOE 1, a law enforcement officer
Represented By
Jessica A. Merejo
PEM Law
contact info
Rajiv D. Parikh
PEM Law
contact info
Kathleen B. Einhorn
PEM Law
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ATLAS DATA PRIVACY CORP, as assignee of individuals who are Covered Persons
Represented By
Jessica A. Merejo
PEM Law
contact info
Eric M. Palmer
Boies Schiller Flexner
contact info
Rajiv D. Parikh
PEM Law
contact info
Adam R. Shaw
Boies Schiller Flexner
contact info
Kathleen B. Einhorn
PEM Law
contact info
Samantha D. Parrish
Boies Schiller Flexner
contact info
Mark C. Mao
Boies Schiller Flexner
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/02/2025 4:15 AM EDT
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (GCH)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants ASL Marketing Inc, Accudata Integrated Marketing Inc, Alumnifinder, College Bound Selection Service, Compact Information Systems LLC, Deepsync Labs, HomeData and Student Research Group in District Court No. 1:24-cv-08451 transferred from Misc. Docket Nos. 24-8047 25-8002 & 25-8003 (GCH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Notice of Appeal
Att: 2 41 pgs District Court Memorandum
Att: 3 8 pgs District Court Order
Att: 4 1 pgs Case Caption
Att: 5 1 pgs Standing Order Excess Pagination
Att: 6 2 pgs Case Opening Letter
1 pgs NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (GCH)
Related: [-]
4 pgs CLERK ORDER As stated in the Court?s March 18, 2025, order permitting these appeals, the appeals are consolidated for all purposes and expedited. Briefing will proceed under the following peremptory schedule: Appellants? joint opening brief must be filed by April 14, 2025. Appellees? joint response brief must be filed by May 12, 2025. Appellants? joint reply brief must be filed by May 27, 2025. The Clerk will calendar the appeals for submission to a merits panel during the week of July 7, 2025. It appears the Attorney General of New Jersey participated in some of the district-court proceedings as an intervenor. If the Attorney General does not intend to participate on appeal, he must promptly advise the Clerk in writing. Otherwise, his brief must be filed by May 12, 2025. The parties should electronically file the briefs and the appendix on all dockets. Motions should be limited to the dockets to which they relate. The appellants? case-opening forms and other individual filings should be filed only on the docket assigned to the filer?s appeal. 25-1555 25-1556 25-1557 25-1558 25-1559 25-1560 25-1561 25-1562 25-1563 25-1564 25-1565 25-1566 25-1567 25-1568 25-1569 25-1570 25-1571 25-1572 25-1573 25-1574 25-1575 25-1576 25-1577 25-1578 25-1579 25-1580 25-1581 25-1582 25-1583 25-1584 25-1585 25-1586 25-1587 25-1588 25-1589 25-1590 25-1591 25-1592 25-1593 (LMR)
Related: [-]
3 pgs ORDER (Clerk) Many of these cases involve two plaintiffs who sued under ?Jane Doe? pseudonyms. It is unclear whether the state court or district court granted them permission to conceal their names. If the ?Jane Doe? plaintiffs wish to continue pseudonymously on appeal, they must either (1) provide a copy of the state- or district-court order granting them pseudonymity or (2) file a motion asking this Court for that relief. If they do neither of those things within fourteen days, they may be required to litigate these appeals under their real names. 25-1555 25-1556 25-1557 25-1558 25-1559 25-1560 25-1561 25-1562 25-1563 25-1564 25-1565 25-1566 25-1567 25-1568 25-1569 25-1570 25-1571 25-1572 25-1573 25-1574 25-1575 25-1576 25-1577 25-1578 25-1579 25-1580 25-1581 25-1582 25-1583 25-1584 25-1585 25-1586 25-1587 25-1588 25-1589 25-1590 25-1591 25-1592 25-1593 (LMR)
Related: [-]
2 pgs CALENDARED for disposition during the week of July 7, 2025. PM. 25-1555 25-1556 25-1557 25-1558 25-1559 25-1560 25-1561 25-1562 25-1563 25-1564 25-1565 25-1566 25-1567 25-1568 25-1569 25-1570 25-1571 25-1572 25-1573 25-1574 25-1575 25-1576 25-1577 25-1578 25-1579 25-1580 25-1581 25-1582 25-1583 25-1584 25-1585 25-1586 25-1587 25-1588 25-1589 25-1590 25-1591 25-1592 25-1593 (PM)
Related: [-]