Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Angel Kelley
Case #: 1:25-cv-10776
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 17, 2025 6:53 AM EDT
Defendant
Director Alisandra Parrish
Represented By
Olivia Rae King Benjamin
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
Acting Director USCI Kika Scott
Camp Springs, MD 20588
Represented By
Olivia Rae King Benjamin
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
20 Massachusetts Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20008
Represented By
Olivia Rae King Benjamin
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
Ayse Nugay
Represented By
Stephanie E.Y. Marzouk
Marzouk Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/14 1:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Olivia Rae King Benjamin on behalf of United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kika Scott, Alisandra Parrish (Benjamin, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
7 7 4 pgs order Order Thu 04/03 8:39 AM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ORDER entered. Standing Order Regarding Motion Practice. (CEH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
6 6 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Wed 04/02 10:36 AM
District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Ahmet Seyithanoglu. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected. Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm] . A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (CEH)
Related: [-]
5 5 order General Order 19-02 Wed 04/02 10:27 AM
General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (CEH)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 04/02 10:26 AM
Summons Issued as to Alisandra Parrish, Kika Scott, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (CEH)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/02 10:24 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ahmet Seyithanoglu Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10927322 by Ayse Nugay.(Marzouk, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Wed 04/02 10:19 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Angel Kelley assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (JKK)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/02 9:38 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10927020 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Ayse Nugay.(Marzouk, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Category Form,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet