California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:William J Lafferty
Case #: 4:25-bk-40572
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2025
Creditor Meeting:Apr 28, 2025
Claims Deadline:Jul 28, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Blackstone Real Estate Investment LLC
479 Aragon St
Vallejo, CA 94591-3400
Represented By
Blackstone Real Estate Investment LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Not Assigned - OK
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oak
Office of the United States Trustee Phillip J. Burton Federal Building 450 Golden Gate Ave. 5th Fl., #05-0153
San Francisco, CA 94102


Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
23 23 misc Substitution of Attorney Thu 04/24 2:01 PM
Substitution of Attorney . Attorney Christina Lauren Goebelsmann terminated. Gregory S. Powell added to the case. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oak (Powell, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 04/23 9:12 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 04/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order Transferring BK Case
21 21 utility Update Transferred Case Wed 04/23 3:44 PM
Updated Transferred Case 2521918. The case has been transferred to Eastern District of California. Case Management Action due after 5/7/2025. (ja)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
20 20 court Inter-District Transmittal Memo Tue 04/22 12:59 PM
Inter-District Transmittal Memo sent to Eastern District. Related [+]. (ja)
Related: [-] 19 Order Transferring BK Case
Monday, April 21, 2025
19 19 order Transfer BK Case Mon 04/21 4:04 PM
Order Transferring Case To The Eastern District Of California (rs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
18 18 motion Extend Time Wed 04/16 12:15 PM
Debtor's Motion to Extend Time to File Case Opening Documents - Filed by Debtor Blackstone Real Estate Investment LLC (vmv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
17 17 misc Response Tue 04/08 12:39 PM
Response Related [+]. Filed by Debtor Blackstone Real Estate Investment LLC (vmv)
Related: [-] 4 Order to Show Cause for Dismissal
Monday, April 07, 2025
16 16 misc Certificate of Service Mon 04/07 4:00 PM
Certificate of Service Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee and Verified Statement Related [+]. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oak (Goebelsmann, Christina)
Related: [-] 15 Appointment of Trustee and Approval of Bond
15 15 2 pgs court Appointment of Trustee and Approval of Bond Mon 04/07 2:52 PM
Appointment of Trustee and Approval of Bond Trustee Christopher Hayes added to the case. Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee and Verified Statement . (Goebelsmann, Christina)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 06, 2025
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/06 9:12 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 04/06/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order and Notice of Status Conference Chp 11
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/06 9:12 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 04/06/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order to File Missing Documents
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Pmt of State and Fed Taxes Sun 04/06 9:12 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Payment of State and Fed Taxes. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/06/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order for Payment of State and Federal Taxes
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sun 04/06 9:12 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/06/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Generate 341 Notices
Saturday, April 05, 2025
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 04/05 9:14 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 04/05/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order to Show Cause for Dismissal
Friday, April 04, 2025
9 9 order Status Conference Chp 11 Fri 04/04 9:16 AM
Order and Notice of Chapter 11 Status Conference Status Conference scheduled for 6/4/2025 at 10:30 AM in/via Oakland Room 220 - Lafferty. Pre-Status Conference Report due by 5/21/2025 (no)
Related: [-]
8 8 court Generate 341 Notices Fri 04/04 9:15 AM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors, and Deadlines (Generated) (no)
Related: [-]
7 7 order File Missing Documents Fri 04/04 9:10 AM
Order to File Required Documents and Notice of Automatic Dismissal . (no)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
6 6 order Payment of Taxes Thu 04/03 10:30 PM
Order for Payment of State and Federal Taxes (admin)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 04/03 8:53 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Phillip John Shine. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oak (Shine, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
4 4 order Show Cause for Dismissal Wed 04/02 6:57 PM
Order To Show Cause Why Case Should Not Be Dismissed Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. §1408 Related [+]. Response due by 4/16/2025. (rs)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Blackstone Real Estate Investment LLC
3 3 misc Creditor Matrix Wed 04/02 11:40 AM
Creditor Matrix Filed by Debtor Blackstone Real Estate Investment LLC (da)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 11 (Business) Wed 04/02 10:10 AM
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/28/2025 at 02:30 PM via UST Teleconference, Call in number/URL: 1-877-991-8832 Passcode: 4101242. Proofs of Claims due by 7/28/2025. (da)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 04/02 10:09 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual, Fee Amount $1738, Filed by Blackstone Real Estate Investment LLC . Application to Employ Counsel by Debtor due by 5/2/2025. Order Meeting of Creditors due by 4/9/2025.Incomplete Filings due by 4/16/2025. (da)
Related: [-]
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Wed 04/02 12:44 PM
Receipt Number 27MVBFAL, Fee Amount $1738.00 Related [+]. (trw)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)