California Central District Court
Judge:Stephen V Wilson
Referred: Brianna Fuller Mircheff
Case #: 2:25-cv-02847
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
7 7 order Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Thu 04/24 3:45 PM
ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (NON-PRISONER CASE) by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: The Request is GRANTED.; granting4 APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
6 6 misc Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only) Mon 04/14 12:14 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Leland Dudek. (Attorney Jennifer Tarn added to party Leland Dudek (pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form Thu 04/03 3:40 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and referred to Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. (sh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
4 4 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Wed 04/02 10:31 AM
APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Rosa Isela Claros. (Pena, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 04/02 10:25 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF Rosa Isela Claros, (Pena, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 04/02 10:24 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Rosa Isela Claros. (Pena, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 04/02 10:23 AM
COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by plaintiff Rosa Isela Claros. (Attorney Jonathan Omar Pena added to party Rosa Isela Claros (pty:pla))(Pena, Jonathan)
Related: [-]