Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:Byron B Conway
Case #: 1:25-cv-00489
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 17, 2025 6:18 AM CDT
Defendant
Gena Kakkak
Defendant
Soaren Management LLC
Defendant
Kraken Holdings LLC
Defendant
Michael Fish, Jr
Defendant
John Does
Defendant
Dana Waubanascum
Defendant
Daynell Grignon
Defendant
Spencer Gauthier
Defendant
Joey Awonohopay
Defendant
Rebecca Brunette
Defendant
Randy Chevalier
Defendant
Crystal Chapman-Chevalier
Defendant
Joan Delabreau
Plaintiff
Jeremy Rickabaugh
Represented By
Thomas M Scott-Railton
Gupta Wessler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Gloria Appiah
Represented By
Thomas M Scott-Railton
Gupta Wessler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Rachel Butler
Represented By
Thomas M Scott-Railton
Gupta Wessler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kathleen Zaccheo
Represented By
Thomas M Scott-Railton
Gupta Wessler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jesse Wilson
Represented By
Thomas M Scott-Railton
Gupta Wessler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Patreese Williams
Represented By
Thomas M Scott-Railton
Gupta Wessler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ruben Villanueva
Represented By
Thomas M Scott-Railton
Gupta Wessler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Spencer Thompson
Represented By
Thomas M Scott-Railton
Gupta Wessler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose Rosario
Represented By
Thomas M Scott-Railton
Gupta Wessler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Morgan Rice
Represented By
Thomas M Scott-Railton
Gupta Wessler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Darlene Moore
Represented By
Thomas M Scott-Railton
Gupta Wessler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole Matos
Represented By
Thomas M Scott-Railton
Gupta Wessler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Greenwood
Represented By
Thomas M Scott-Railton
Gupta Wessler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alice Gill
Represented By
Thomas M Scott-Railton
Gupta Wessler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jerome Cole
Represented By
Thomas M Scott-Railton
Gupta Wessler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Dorothea Fulmore
Represented By
Thomas M Scott-Railton
Gupta Wessler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrew Fuentes
Represented By
Thomas M Scott-Railton
Gupta Wessler LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 40 minutes ago
Thursday, May 22, 2025
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 05/22 11:56 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joey Awonohopay - Waiver sent on 4/24/2025; Rebecca Brunette - Waiver sent on 4/24/2025; Crystal Chapman-Chevalier - Waiver sent on 4/24/2025; Randy Chevalier - Waiver sent on 4/24/2025; Michael Fish, Jr - Waiver sent on 4/24/2025; Spencer Gauthier - Waiver sent on 4/24/2025; Daynell Grignon - Waiver sent on 4/24/2025; Gena Kakkak - Waiver sent on 4/24/2025; Dana Waubanascum - Waiver sent on 4/24/2025.(Scott-Railton, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Waiver of service of summons,
Att: 2 Waiver of service of summons,
Att: 3 Waiver of service of summons,
Att: 4 Waiver of service of summons,
Att: 5 Waiver of service of summons,
Att: 6 Waiver of service of summons,
Att: 7 Waiver of service of summons,
Att: 8 Waiver of service of summons
Monday, May 19, 2025
4 4 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Mon 05/19 3:23 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Scott-Railton, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement Thu 05/08 3:58 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Scott-Railton, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
notice Notice by Clerk to Counsel Re Consent to Magistrate Fri 05/02 11:18 AM
NOTICE from the clerk to Plaintiffs requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Dries be filed within 21 days; the form is available[LINK:here] . In addition, pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement within 7 days. (jmk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
service Summons Issued Tue 04/22 9:40 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (lh)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
2 2 misc Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 04/21 3:05 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs(Scott-Railton, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Crystal Chapman-Chevalier,
Att: 2 Summons Dana Waubanuscum,
Att: 3 Summons Daynell Grignon,
Att: 4 Summons Gena Kakkak,
Att: 5 Summons Joan Delabreau,
Att: 6 Summons Joey Awonohopay,
Att: 7 Summons Kraken Holdings, LLC,
Att: 8 Summons Michael Fish Jr.,
Att: 9 Summons Randy Chevalier,
Att: 10 Summons Rebecca Brunette,
Att: 11 Summons Spencer Gauthier
Thursday, April 03, 2025
misc Case Opening Modification Thu 04/03 8:31 AM
Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the[LINK:attorney case opening instructions] , the[LINK:summons instructions] and the[LINK:party name guidelines found in the user manual] for further guidance (lh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
1 1 54 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/02 4:18 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Darlene Moore, Spencer Thompson, Patreese Williams, Jerome Cole, Jesse Wilson, Nicole Matos, Ruben Villanueva, Morgan Rice, Jeremy Rickabaugh, Andrew Fuentes, Joseph Greenwood, Kathleen Zaccheo, Alice Gill, Rachel Butler, Dorothea Fulmore, Jose Rosario, Gloria Appiah. ( Filing Fee PAID $405 receipt number AWIEDC-4920709)(Scott-Railton, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1- Constitution and Bylaws,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2- Code 740-6,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3- 2023 MITW Annual Report
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Wed 04/02 4:23 PM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to District Judge Byron B Conway; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available[LINK:here.] Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
Related: [-]