Pennsylvania Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John C Melaragno
Case #: 2:25-bk-20816
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2025

TypePartnership
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Crane Room Limited Partnership
3001 Wilmington Rd
New Castle, PA 16105-1221
Represented By
Ryan J Cooney
Cooney Law Offices LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
1000 Liberty Avenue Suite 1316
Pittsburgh, PA 15222


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 6:06 PM EDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
45 45 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 05/17 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 05/16/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] :42 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
44 44 court Hearing Cancelled Wed 05/14 11:32 AM
Text Order: In light of the Order Dismissing Case Issued at Docket Entry No.42 on 5/14/2025, Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for the Debtor in the Absence of Client Consent is Dismissed as MOOT. The Hearing Scheduled For 5/15/2025 is Cancelled. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order and notice on this matter. Judge Melaragno Signed on 5/14/2025. Related [+]. (dkam)
Related: [-] :29 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Attorney Cooney Law Offices, LLC
43 43 court Hearing Cancelled Wed 05/14 11:29 AM
Text Order: In light of the Order Dismissing Case Issued at Docket Entry No.42 on 5/14/2025, Application to Employ Cooney Law Offices, LLC as Counsel for the Debtor is Dismissed as MOOT. The Hearing Scheduled For 5/15/2025 is Cancelled. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order and notice on this matter. Judge Melaragno Signed on 5/14/2025. Related [+]. (dkam)
Related: [-] :19 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership
42 42 order Dismiss Case or Debtor Wed 05/14 11:22 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case Without Prejudice Related [+] Signed on 5/14/2025. Case Ready For Closing on 5/29/2025. (obro)
Related: [-] 38
41 41 misc Certificate of No Objection Wed 05/14 9:21 AM
Certificate of No Objection Re: Expedited Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Sections 305(a)(1) and 1112(b) Regarding the Hearing on 5/15/2025. Filed by Attorney Cooney Law Offices, LLC Related [+]. (Cooney, Ryan)
Related: [-] :1 Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership,29 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Attorney Cooney Law Offices, LLC,30 Hearing on a Judge Melaragno Case Set by Attorney or Trustee filed by Attorney Cooney Law Offices, LLC,36 Order on Motion to Extend Time to Complete the Bankruptcy Filing,38 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership,39 Order Scheduling a Hearing
Thursday, May 08, 2025
40 40 misc Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7 Thu 05/08 11:22 AM
Certificate of Service Re: Notice and Order Setting Hearing on an Expedited Basis and Expedited Motion to Dismiss Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Sections 305(a)(1) and 1112(b) Regarding the Hearing on 5/15/2025. Filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership Related [+]. (Cooney, Ryan)
Related: [-] :1 Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership,29 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Attorney Cooney Law Offices, LLC,30 Hearing on a Judge Melaragno Case Set by Attorney or Trustee filed by Attorney Cooney Law Offices, LLC,36 Order on Motion to Extend Time to Complete the Bankruptcy Filing,38 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership,39 Order Scheduling a Hearing
39 39 court Hearing Set E Thu 05/08 10:20 AM
Order Scheduling Expedited Hearing on Related [+]. Expedited Hearing scheduled for 5/15/2025 at 01:30 PM via p03 Courtroom C, 54th Floor, U.S. Steel Tower, Pittsburgh. Responses due by 5/13/2025. (dkam)
Related: [-] :38 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
38 38 motion Dismiss Case or Debtor Wed 05/07 4:37 PM
Expedited Motion to Dismiss Case Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Sections 305(a)(1) and 1112(b) Filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership. (Cooney, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Local Form 20
Friday, May 02, 2025
37 37 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 05/03 12:31 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 05/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] :36 Order on Motion to Extend Time to Complete the Bankruptcy Filing
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
36 36 order Extend Time to Complete the Bankruptcy Filing Wed 04/30 10:32 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Complete the Bankruptcy Filing Related [+]. FURTHER ORDERED that the Debtor is instructed to immediately obtainalternate counsel who shall enter his or her appearance prior to the May 15, 2025 hearing on the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for the Debtor in the Absence of Client Consent. Signed on 4/30/2025. Atty Disclosure Statement due 5/30/2025 for1 and for 10 ,. Declaration of Schedules due 5/30/2025 for1 and for 10 ,. List of Equity Security Holders due 5/30/2025 for1 and for 10 ,. Statement of Current Monthly Income FR 122B due by 5/30/2025. Schedule A/B due 5/30/2025. Schedule D due 5/30/2025 for1 and for 10 ,. Schedule E/F due 5/30/2025. Schedule G due 5/30/2025 for1 and for 10 ,. Schedule H due 5/30/2025 for1 and for 10 ,. Statement of Financial Affairs due 5/30/2025 for1 and for 10 ,. Summary of schedules due 5/30/2025 for1 and for 10 ,. Incomplete Filings due by 5/30/2025 for1 and for 10 ,. Declaration Re: Electronic Filing due 5/30/2025 for1 and for 10 ,.. (lfin)
Related: [-] 35 :1 Voluntary Petition Chapter 11, 10 Update Incomplete Filings Deadlines
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
35 35 motion Extend Time to Complete the Bankruptcy Filing Tue 04/29 12:13 PM
Second Motion to Extend Time to Complete the Bankruptcy Filing Filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership. (Cooney, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 25, 2025
34 34 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 04/25 8:32 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Daniel R. Schimizzi Filed by Creditor GEM Building Contractors and Developers, Inc. (Schimizzi, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
33 33 order Order -Non-motion related- WITHOUT FORMS - FOR CRD USE Thu 04/24 11:03 AM
TEXT ORDER *** The hearing on the Application to Employ Cooney Law Offices, LLC as Counsel for the Debtor previously scheduled for 5/15/2025 at 2:00 PM remain scheduled on the same date but the TIME HAS BEEN CHANGED TO 1:30 PM. Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 5/15/2025 at 1:30 PM via Courtroom C, 54th Floor, U.S. Steel Tower, Pittsburgh, PA 15219. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order and notice on this matter. Judge Melaragno Signed on 4/24/2025.. (dkam)
Related: [-] :19 Application to Employ
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
32 32 misc Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7 Tue 04/22 1:23 PM
Amended Certificate of Service Re: Notice of Hearing and Response Deadline and Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for the Debtor in the Absence of Client Consent Regarding the Hearing on 5/15/2025. Filed by Attorney Cooney Law Offices, LLC Related [+]. (Cooney, Ryan)
Related: [-] :1 Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership,19 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership,29 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Attorney Cooney Law Offices, LLC,30 Hearing on a Judge Melaragno Case Set by Attorney or Trustee filed by Attorney Cooney Law Offices, LLC
Att: 1 Complete Mailing Matrix
31 31 order Order -Non-motion related- WITHOUT FORMS - FOR CRD USE Tue 04/22 10:24 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Revised Exhibit A filed on 4/10/2025 at docket entry No. 24 is hereby DISMISSED for failure to revise and refile the filing per the Text Order issued on 4/11/2025. This dismissal is without prejudice to the pleader refiling an amended version of the Exhibit A on or before fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order and notice on this matter. Judge Melaragno Signed on 4/22/2025. Related [+]. (dkam)
Related: [-] :24 Exhibit, 25 Order Fixing Deadline to Deny a Motion
Monday, April 21, 2025
30 30 misc Hearing on a Judge Melaragno Case Set by Attorney or Trustee Mon 04/21 2:21 PM
Hearing on Motion of Ryan J. Cooney, Paul R. Toigo and Cooney Law Offices, LLC to Withdraw as Counsel for the Debtor in the Absence of Client Consent Filed by Attorney Cooney Law Offices, LLC Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 5/15/2025 at 01:30 PM via p03 Courtroom C, 54th Floor, U.S. Steel Tower, Pittsburgh. Responses due by 5/8/2025. (Cooney, Ryan)
Related: [-] :29 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Attorney Cooney Law Offices, LLC
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Att: 2 Complete Mailing Matrix
29 29 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 04/21 2:02 PM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for the Debtor in the Absence of Client Consent Filed by Attorney Cooney Law Offices, LLC. (Cooney, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 17, 2025
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 04/18 12:31 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/17/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] :27 Order on Motion to Extend Time to Complete the Bankruptcy Filing
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
27 27 order Extend Time to Complete the Bankruptcy Filing Tue 04/15 4:01 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Complete the Bankruptcy Filing Related [+] Signed on 4/15/2025. Atty Disclosure Statement due 4/30/2025 for1 and for 10 ,. Declaration of Schedules due 4/30/2025 for1 and for 10 ,. List of Equity Security Holders due 4/30/2025 for1 and for 10 ,. Statement of Current Monthly Income FR 122B due by 4/30/2025. Schedule A/B due 4/30/2025. Schedule D due 4/30/2025 for1 and for 10 ,. Schedule E/F due 4/30/2025. Schedule G due 4/30/2025 for1 and for 10 ,. Schedule H due 4/30/2025 for1 and for 10 ,. Statement of Financial Affairs due 4/30/2025 for1 and for 10 ,. Summary of schedules due 4/30/2025 for1 and for 10 ,. Incomplete Filings due by 4/30/2025 for1 and for 10 ,. Declaration Re: Electronic Filing due 4/30/2025 for1 and for 10 ,.. (lfin)
Related: [-] 26 :1 Voluntary Petition Chapter 11, 10 Update Incomplete Filings Deadlines
26 26 motion Extend Time to Complete the Bankruptcy Filing Tue 04/15 12:59 PM
Motion to Extend Time to Complete the Bankruptcy Filing Filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership. (Cooney, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 11, 2025
25 25 order Fixing Deadline to Deny a Motion Fri 04/11 10:14 AM
Text Order re: (24 Exhibit).. Without further notice or hearing, this pleading will be stricken without prejudice if the following action is not taken: COUNSEL MUST REFILE ENSURING THAT ALL ATTACHED PDFS ARE CRISP, CLEAR AND LEGIBLE.. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order and notice on this matter. Judge Melaragno Signed on 4/11/2025. Related [+]. Required corrective action due on or before 4/18/2025. (dkam)
Related: [-] :24 Exhibit
Thursday, April 10, 2025
24 24 misc Exhibit Thu 04/10 1:45 PM
Exhibit A Related [+] for Expedited Motion for Order to Authorize Payment of Pre-Petition Salaries, Wages and Taxes Filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership (Cooney, Ryan)
Related: [-] vised
23 23 misc Proposed Order Thu 04/10 9:22 AM
Proposed Order RE: Approving Counsel for the Debtor Filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership Related [+]. (Cooney, Ryan)
Related: [-] :1 Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership,19 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership, 22 Order Fixing Deadline to Deny a Motion
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
22 22 order Fixing Deadline to Deny a Motion Wed 04/09 9:33 AM
Text Order re: (19 Application to Employ).. Without further notice or hearing, this pleading will be stricken without prejudice if the following action is not taken:ATTORNEY TO REFILE THE PROPOSED ORDER USING JUDGE MELARAGNO'S FORM JCM 001, ORDER APPROVING DEBTOR'S COUNSEL, AND LINK IT BACK TO THE MOTION. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order and notice on this matter. Judge Melaragno Signed on 4/9/2025. Related [+]. Required corrective action due on or before 4/17/2025. (dkam)
Related: [-] :19 Application to Employ
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
21 21 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 04/08 2:08 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Gregory C. Michaels Filed by Creditor Valerie Measel (Michaels, Gregory)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Hearing on a Judge Melaragno Case Set by Attorney or Trustee Tue 04/08 11:18 AM
Hearing on Application to Employ Cooney Law Offices, LLC as Counsel for the Debtor Filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 5/15/2025 at 02:00 PM via p03 Courtroom C, 54th Floor, U.S. Steel Tower, Pittsburgh. Responses due by 4/25/2025. (Cooney, Ryan)
Related: [-] :19 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Att: 2 Complete Mailing Matrix
19 19 3 pgs motion Employ Tue 04/08 11:10 AM
Application to Employ Cooney Law Offices, LLC as Counsel for the Debtor Filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership. (Cooney, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Verification
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Sunday, April 06, 2025
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 04/07 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/06/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] :17 Order
Friday, April 04, 2025
17 17 4 pgs order Order Fri 04/04 3:23 PM
Order Granting Expedited Motion for Order to Authorize Payment of Pre-Petition Salaries, Wages and Taxes Related [+] Signed on 4/4/2025. (lfin)
Related: [-] 11
16 16 court Hearing Held Fri 04/04 3:07 PM
Hearing Held on 4/4/2025 Related [+]. (dkam)
Related: [-] :11 Motion filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership
15 15 answer Response Fri 04/04 11:51 AM
Response Regarding the Hearing on 04/04/25. Filed by Office of the United States Trustee Related [+]. (Buchanan, William)
Related: [-] :11 Motion filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership,12 Order Scheduling a Hearing
14 14 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 04/04 8:56 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jeffrey Thomas Criswell Filed by Creditor Valerie Measel (Criswell, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
13 13 misc Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7 Thu 04/03 2:34 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Notice and Order Setting Hearing on an Expedited Basis and Expedited Motion for Order to Authorize Payment of Pre-Petition Salaries, Wages and Taxes Regarding the Hearing on 4/4/2025. Filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership Related [+]. (Cooney, Ryan)
Related: [-] :11 Motion filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership,12 Order Scheduling a Hearing
12 12 court Hearing Set E Thu 04/03 12:29 PM
Order Scheduling an Expedited Hearing on Related [+]. Expedited Hearing scheduled for 4/4/2025 at 01:00 PM via p03 Courtroom C, 54th Floor, U.S. Steel Tower, Pittsburgh. Responses due by NOON on 4/4/2025. (dkam)
Related: [-] :11 Motion filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership
11 11 motion Generic Motion Thu 04/03 11:46 AM
Expedited Motion for Order to Authorize Payment of Pre-Petition Salaries, Wages and Taxes Filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership. (Cooney, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Att: 3 Local Form 20
10 10 utility Update Incomplete Filings Deadlines Thu 04/03 8:59 AM
Deadlines Updated Related [+]. List of Equity Security Holders due 4/16/2025. (lfin)
Related: [-] :1 Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership
9 9 court Notice of Additional Filing Deficiencies Thu 04/03 8:54 AM
Notice of Additional Filing Deficiencies. Assigned Judge: Melaragno.. Pursuant to Local Rule 1017-2, the United States Trustee is deemed to have filed a Motion To Dismiss this case, and that Motion will be deemed GRANTED, if any deadline set forth in the first docket entry or any of the following deadlines is not met. Incomplete Filings: LIST OF EQUITY SECURITY HOLDERS Related [+]. Incomplete Filings due by 4/16/2025. (lfin)
Related: [-] :1 Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership
8 8 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 04/03 8:45 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by William M. Buchanan Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the United States Trustee (Buchanan, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
7 7 misc Tax Information Wed 04/02 12:54 PM
Tax Information for the Year for 2023 Filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership Related [+]. (Cooney, Ryan)
Related: [-] :1 Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership
6 6 misc Declaration Wed 04/02 12:52 PM
Declaration re: The Non-Existence of Balance Sheet, Statement of Operations, and Cash Flow Statement Filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership (Cooney, Ryan)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice Wed 04/02 12:36 PM
Notice Regarding Authorization to File. Filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership Related [+]. (Cooney, Ryan)
Related: [-] :1 Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership
4 4 crditcrd none Wed 04/02 12:29 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition Chapter 11([LINK 25-20816 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A17111409, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29 Wed 04/02 12:29 PM
Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix Filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership (Cooney, Ryan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Wed 04/02 12:28 PM
List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Filed by Debtor Crane Room Limited Partnership (Cooney, Ryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 Wed 04/02 12:23 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Crane Room Limited Partnership Government Proof of Claim due by 09/29/2025. Declaration Re: Electronic Filing due 04/16/2025. Chapter 11 Plan due by 07/31/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 07/31/2025. Chapter 11 Small Business Plan due by 09/29/2025. Balance Sheet due by 4/9/2025. Cash Flow Statement due by 4/9/2025. Statement of Operations due by 4/9/2025. Tax Information due by 4/9/2025. Atty Disclosure Statement due 04/16/2025. Declaration of Schedules due 04/16/2025. Schedule A/B due 04/16/2025. Schedule C due 04/16/2025. Schedule D due 04/16/2025. Schedule E/F due 04/16/2025. Schedule G due 04/16/2025. Schedule H due 04/16/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs due 04/16/2025. Summary of schedules due 04/16/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 04/16/2025. (Cooney, Ryan)
Related: [-]