NAOUI, LLC
Maryland Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Case #: | 1:25-bk-12871 |
Case Filed: | Apr 02, 2025 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
NAOUI, LLC
2006 Searles Rd
Dundalk, MD 21222-3157 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee - Baltimore
Garmatz Federal Courthouse 101 West Lombard Street Suite 2625
Baltimore, MD 21201 |
Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago |
Saturday, April 26, 2025 | ||
31 | 31
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/26/2025. (Admin.) |
|
30 | 30
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/26/2025. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 25, 2025 | ||
29 | 29
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/25/2025. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, April 24, 2025 | ||
28 | 28
![]() Notice and Order Extending Time to File Master Mailing Matrix, Names and Addresses of Equity Security Holders, Statement of Financial Affairs, Schedule D, and Summary of Assets and Liabilities. Master Mailing Matrix due 5/2/2025, Names and Addresses of Equity Security Holders due 5/2/2025, Statement of Financial Affairs due 5/2/2025, Schedule D due 5/2/2025, Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 5/2/2025. Incomplete filings due 5/2/2025. . (Paige, Chanel). Modified on 4/24/2025 to correct linkage (Paige, Chanel) |
|
27 | 27
![]() Order Dissolving Show Cause Order After Response . (Paige, Chanel) |
|
Wednesday, April 23, 2025 | ||
26 | 26
![]() Certificate of Service Certificate of Compliance with Local Rule Bankruptcy Rule 1009-1 Filed by Duane R Demers. (Demers, Duane) |
|
25 | 25
![]() Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Filed by Duane R Demers . (Demers, Duane) |
|
24 | 24
![]() Certificate of Service of Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case Filed by Duane R Demers. (Demers, Duane) |
|
23 | 23
![]() Verification of Creditor Matrix on behalf of NAOUI, LLC Filed by Duane R Demers. (Demers, Duane) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
22 | 22
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Duane R Demers . (Demers, Duane) |
|
21 | 21
![]() Equity Security Holders Filed by Duane R Demers. (Demers, Duane) |
|
20 | 20
court
Deficiency Notice
Wed 04/23 1:36 PM
Deficiency Notice re: Certificate of Service missing, Declaration not filed, Amendment fee not paid . Cured Pleading due by 5/7/2025. (Paige, Chanel) |
|
Tuesday, April 22, 2025 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Duane R Demers. (Demers, Duane) |
|
18 | 18
![]() Amended Voluntary Petition EIN previously redacted Filed by Duane R Demers. (Demers, Duane) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
17 | 17
![]() Response to Show Cause Order on behalf of NAOUI, LLC Filed by Duane R Demers . (Demers, Duane) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Monday, April 21, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Application to Employ Duane R. Demers as Attorney and Verified Statement of Proposed Party Filed by NAOUI, LLC. (Demers, Duane) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
15 | 15
![]() Rule 2016 Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Duane R Demers. (Demers, Duane) |
|
Thursday, April 10, 2025 | ||
14 | 14
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/10/2025. (Admin.) |
|
13 | 13
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/10/2025. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, April 09, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/09/2025. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, April 08, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Deficiency Notice re: Debtor's EIN on Voluntary Petition . Cured Pleading due by 4/22/2025. (Paige, Chanel) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Order That Debtor Show Cause Why Case Should Not Be Dismissed. Response to Show Cause Order due by 4/22/2025. (Paige, Chanel) |
|
Monday, April 07, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Order Directing Debtor's Counsel to Comply With Local Bankruptcy Rule 2016-1(b) . (Paige, Chanel) |
|
Saturday, April 05, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/05/2025. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 04, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Creditor Request for Notices Filed by Selene Finance LP as the mortgage servicer for WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY, BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR IBIS HOLDINGS A TRUST. (Labell, Keith) |
|
Thursday, April 03, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by US Trustee - Baltimore. (Vetter, Gerard) |
|
Wednesday, April 02, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
court
Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Wed 04/02 11:56 PM
Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Support Document Corporate Resolution and Authorization Filed by Duane R Demers. (Demers, Duane) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Verification of Creditor Matrix on behalf of NAOUI, LLC Filed by Duane R Demers. (Demers, Duane) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 04/02 6:49 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-12871 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt number A43680613. Fee amount 1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual . Fee Amount $1738 Filed by NAOUI, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Exclusivity expires 07/31/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 09/29/2025. (Demers, Duane) |