California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Barry Russell
Case #: 2:25-bk-12747
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Shahinaz Soliman Clinic Corp.
2780 Skypark Dr Ste 115
Torrance, CA 90505-5342
Represented By
Michael Jay Berger
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
62 62 notice Notice of Hearing (BK Case) Wed 04/30 2:12 PM
Notice of Hearing Notice Of Hearing On Debtors Notice Setting/Increasing Insider Compensation For Dr. Shahinaz Soliman Filed by Debtor Shahinaz Soliman Clinic Corp.. (Berger, Michael)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Wed 04/30 3:35 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Hearing to be held on 05/27/2025 at 10:00 AM 255 E. Temple St.Courtroom 1668Los Angeles, CA 90012. The hearing judge is Barry Russell (SF)
Related: [-] 61 Opposition filed by Teresa Trutanic
Monday, April 28, 2025
61 61 answer Opposition Mon 04/28 3:37 PM
Opposition to Related [+] Limited Opposition to Debtor's Notice of Setting/Increasing Insider Compensation of Dr. Shahinaz Soliman, M.D.; Declaration of Anthony J. Napolitano Filed by Creditor Teresa Trutanic (Napolitano, Anthony)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Shahinaz Soliman Clinic Corp.
60 60 misc Declaration That No Party Requested a Hearing on Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)(3)) Mon 04/28 2:51 PM
Declaration That No Party Requested a Hearing on Motion (LBR 9013-1(o)(3)) Filed by Debtor Shahinaz Soliman Clinic Corp. Related [+]. (Berger, Michael)
Related: [-] 28 Application to Employ Michael Jay Berger as General Bankruptcy Counsel
Friday, April 25, 2025
59 59 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 04/25 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/25/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 57 Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral (BNC-PDF)
58 58 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 04/25 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/25/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 56 Order on Generic Motion (BNC-PDF)
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
57 57 2 pgs order Use Cash Collateral (BNC-PDF) Wed 04/23 10:31 AM
Order Granting Motion Authorizing Interim Use Cash Collateral (see order for details)(BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/23/2025 (SF)
Related: [-] 23
56 56 order X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF) Wed 04/23 9:33 AM
Order Granting on an interim basis debtor's motion for order authorizing debtor to maintain prepetition bank accounts (see order for details) (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/23/2025 (SF)
Related: [-] 20