South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:25-cv-01660
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 26, 2025 6:22 AM EDT
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
Defendant
UTC Fire & Securities Americas
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899
Defendant
Royal Chemical Company LTD
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
Mine Respirator Company LLC
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-20
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
Defendant
EI DuPont De Nemours and Company
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523
Defendant
Carrier Fire & Security Americas Corp Inc
Defendant
3M Company
3M Center
St. Paul, MN 55133
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Defendant
Angus Fire Armour Corporation
141 Junny Road
Angier, NC 27501
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
BASF Corporation
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
13995 Pasteur Boulevard
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Plaintiff
Mark Medacco, Jr.
Represented By
James L Ferraro, Jr
The Ferraro Law Firm PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
3 3 misc MDL Member Case Opened Wed 04/02 11:35 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 3/12/2025), Mark Medacco, Jr., v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:25-cv-01660-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Middle District of Florida (jbin)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 04/02 11:33 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
1 1 55 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/02 11:32 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12320414.), filed by Mark Medacco, Jr. Service due by 6/10/2025 (jbin)
Related: [-]