California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Victoria S Kaufman
Case #: 1:25-bk-10524
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 07, 2025

Debtor
BH Roofing & Development, Inc.
6860 Canby Ave
Reseda, CA 91335-4311
Represented By
Marc Weinberg
Law Office Of Marc Weinberg
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Jeremy W. Faith (TR)
16030 Ventura Blvd., Suite 470
Encino, CA 91436
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 04/03/2025 1:18 AM PDT
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 04/02 12:04 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:1:25-bk-10524] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58238982. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Wed 04/02 12:02 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by BH Roofing & Development, Inc. (Weinberg, Marc)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Wed 04/02 12:42 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Faith (TR), Jeremy W. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/7/2025 at 10:30 AM via Zoom - Faith: Meeting ID 973 812 7924, Passcode 8746194099, Phone 1 747 281 2473. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]