California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Ronald A Clifford III
Case #: 9:25-bk-10444
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2025
Creditor Meeting:May 01, 2025

Debtor
Diversified Panels Systems, Inc.
2345 Statham Blvd
Oxnard, CA 93033-3911
Represented By
William E. Winfield
Nelson Comis Kettle & Kinney LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Amy L Goldman (TR)
633 W 5th Street, Suite 4000
Los Angeles, CA 90071
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (ND)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 04/03/2025 1:18 AM PDT
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 04/02 1:23 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:9:25-bk-10444] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58239586. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 69 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Wed 04/02 1:16 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Diversified Panels Systems, Inc. (Winfield, William)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corp Resolution Auth Filing Wed 04/02 1:21 PM
Corporate resolution authorizing filing of petitions Filed by Debtor Diversified Panels Systems, Inc.. (Winfield, William)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Wed 04/02 1:42 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Goldman (TR), Amy L with 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/1/2025 at 01:30 PM via Zoom - Goldman: Meeting ID 630 029 1769, Passcode 3548121645, Phone 1 747 285 4196. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]