California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:25-cr-01000
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 04, 2025 1:03 AM PDT
Defendant
Angela Yessenia Banda (1)
Represented By
Veronica Portillo-Heap
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Defendant
Janna Elizabeth Burns (3)
Represented By
David J Zugman
Burcham & Zugman
contact info
Defendant
Kloe Elizabeth Preston (2)
Represented By
Kenneth J Troiano
Law Office Of Kenneth J Troiano
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Parker Gardner-Erickson
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/04/2025 2:40 AM PDT
Friday, March 07, 2025
Arrest of Angela Yessenia Banda, Kloe Elizabeth Preston, Janna Elizabeth Burns (no document attached) (nbp) [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Angela Yessenia Banda, Kloe Elizabeth Preston, Janna Elizabeth Burns.(nbp) [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Angela Yessenia Banda, Kloe Elizabeth Preston, Janna Elizabeth Burns: Initial Appearance set for 3/10/2025 before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. (no document attached) (gac) [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Parker Gardner-Erickson appearing for USA. (Gardner-Erickson, Parker)Attorney Parker Gardner-Erickson added to party USA(pty:pla) (yxc). [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher: Initial Appearance as to Angela Yessenia Banda, Kloe Elizabeth Preston, Janna Elizabeth Burns held on 3/10/2025. Federal Defenders Appointed for Angela Yessenia Banda,Kenneth J Troiano (N/A) Appointed for Kloe Elizabeth Preston, and David J Zugman (N/A) Appointedfor Janna Elizabeth Burns. Financial Affidavits filed. Bond packets due for all defendants on 3/17/25 and travel extended through the State of California. Bond set as to Angela Yessenia Banda (1), Kloe Elizabeth Preston (2) and Janna Elizabeth Burns (3): $15,000 PS (1 FRRA). Preliminary Hearing set for 3/20/25 @ 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E Butcher. Arraignment set for 4/1/25 @ 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E Butcher. (CD# 3/10/2025 DEB 318-334; 353-405; 414-421). (Plaintiff Attorney Julia Cline AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Kyra Sinclair FD). (ecf) [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
6 6 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Angela Yessenia Banda re 4 Initial Appearance (w/ Schedules), Terminate Deadlines and Hearings. (dxj) [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USMS read
10 10 $15,000 PS (1 FRRA) Bond Filed as to Angela Yessenia Banda Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 3/10/2025. (Document applicable to USA, Angela Yessenia Banda.) (ave) [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
11 11 $15,000 PS (1 FRRA) Bond Filed as to Kloe Elizabeth Preston Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 3/10/2025. (Document applicable to USA, Kloe Elizabeth Preston.) (ave) [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER as to Kloe Elizabeth Preston: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 3/10/25. (ecf) [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER as to Angela Yessenia Banda: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 3/10/25. (ecf) [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
14 14 $15,000 PS (1 FRRA) Bond Filed as to Janna Elizabeth Burns Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 3/10/2025. (Document applicable to USA, Janna Elizabeth Burns.) (ave) [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
15 15 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Angela Yessenia Banda (ave) [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
16 16 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Kloe Elizabeth Preston (ave) [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
17 17 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Janna Elizabeth Burns (ave) [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Angela Yessenia Banda (1) $15,000 PS (1 FRRA). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 3/10/2025. (ave) [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
19 19 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Kloe Elizabeth Preston (2) $15,000 PS (1 FRRA). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 3/10/2025. (ave) [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
20 20 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Janna Elizabeth Burns (3) $15,000 PS (1 FRRA). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 3/10/2025. (ave) [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
21 21 ORDER as to Janna Elizabeth Burns: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 3/10/25. (ecf) [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
5 5 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Angela Yessenia Banda, Kloe Elizabeth Preston, Janna Elizabeth Burns (no document attached) (ecf) [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Veronica Portillo-Heap appearing for Angela Yessenia Banda (Portillo-Heap, Veronica)Attorney Veronica Portillo-Heap added to party Angela Yessenia Banda(pty:dft) (jmo). [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
8 8 Notice of Assertion of Rights by Angela Yessenia Banda (Portillo-Heap, Veronica) (jmo). [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
9 9 BAIL REVIEW PACKET as to Janna Elizabeth Burns. Report prepared by: E.Khoury. (Document applicable to USA, Janna Elizabeth Burns.) (Khoury, E.) [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
22 22 BAIL REVIEW PACKET as to Kloe Elizabeth Preston. Report prepared by: C. Ramirez. (Document applicable to USA, Kloe Elizabeth Preston.) (Ramirez, C.) [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
23 23 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Kloe Elizabeth Preston re11 Bond. (dxj) [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USMS read
24 24 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Janna Elizabeth Burns re14 Bond. (dxj) [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USMS read
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
25 25 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing Rule 5.1 by Kloe Elizabeth Preston (Troiano, Kenneth) (ggv). [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
26 26 BAIL REVIEW PACKET as to Angela Yessenia Banda. Report prepared by: J. Navarro. (Document applicable to USA, Angela Yessenia Banda.) (Gomez, B.) [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
27 27 NOTICE of Vacated Hearing(s): 03/20/2025 Preliminary Hearing vacated re25 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing Rule 5.1 (no document attached) (dxj) [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
29 29 Order on Stipulated Continuance of a Preliminary Hearing as to Janna Elizabeth Burns. Preliminary Hearing set for 4/1/2025 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 3/12/2025. (rxc) [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
28 28 Completed 15,000 Bond Filed as to Janna Elizabeth Burns Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 3/13/2025. (Document applicable to USA, Janna Elizabeth Burns.) (dxj) [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
31 31 Order on Stipulated Continuance of a Preliminary Hearing as to Angela Yessenia Banda. Preliminary Hearing set for 4/1/2025 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 03/13/2025. (ggv) [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
30 30 MINUTE ORDER as to Kloe Elizabeth Preston. At the request of defense counsel, the Court extend the bond packet deadline until noon on Friday 3/21/2025. The Court also sets a Bond Hearing for 3/18/2025 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 3/14/2025. (no document attached) (dxj) [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
32 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher: Bond Hearing as to Kloe Elizabeth Preston held on 3/18/2025. Defendant present on bond. Defense counsel submits a new bond packet to the Court. The Court will review the bond packet and if there are any issues the Court will contact defense counsel. (CD# 3/18/2025 DEB 25: 1:37-1:38). (Plaintiff Attorney Julia Cline, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Kenneth Troiano, CJA). (no document attached) (dxj) [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
33 33 Appearance Bond Bond Filed as to Kloe Elizabeth Preston in amount of $ $15,000 PS (1 FRRA), (Document applicable to USA, Kloe Elizabeth Preston.) (anh) [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
34 34 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Gardner-Erickson, Parker) (axi). [3:25-mj-01053-DEB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
35 35 INFORMATION as to Angela Yessenia Banda (1) count(s) 1, Kloe Elizabeth Preston (2) count(s) 1, Janna Elizabeth Burns (3) count(s) 1. (tkl)
Related: [-]
36 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher: All three defendants appearing on bond.Arraignment on Information as to Angela Yessenia Banda (1) Count 1 and Kloe Elizabeth Preston (2) Count 1 and Janna Elizabeth Burns (3) Count 1 held on 4/1/2025. Not Guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 5/19/2025 09:00 AM before District Judge William Q. Hayes. (CD# 4/1/2025 DEB 25: 1:31-1:44). (Plaintiff Attorney Bianca Calderon-Penaloza, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Veronica Portillo-Heap/ Kenneth Troaino/ David Zugman.). (dxj)
Related: [-]