California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:25-cr-01022
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 03, 2025 12:35 AM PDT
Defendant
Dorotea Valeriano Martinez (1)
Represented By
Lynette M. Belsky
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Kaley Schall Chan
Doj-Usao
contact info
Allison Rogge
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Apr 08 2025
JUDGMENT as to Dorotea Valeriano Martinez (1), Count(s) 1, CBOP for Time Served. $10.00 S.A - remitted. No Fine. Appeal rights waived.; Count(s) 2, Government oral motion to dismiss underlying counts without prejudice - granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres (exs)

Docket last updated: 04/03/2025 3:41 AM PDT
Friday, March 14, 2025
Arrest of Dorotea Valeriano Martinez (no document attached) (mme) [3:25-mj-01216-VET]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Dorotea Valeriano Martinez.(mme) [3:25-mj-01216-VET]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Dorotea Valeriano Martinez: Initial Appearance set for 3/17/2025 before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres. (no document attached) (fjp) [3:25-mj-01216-VET]
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres: Initial Appearance as to Dorotea Valeriano Martinez held on 3/17/2025. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Dorotea Valeriano Martinez. Government oral motion to detain(Flight). ( Detention Hearing - RF set for 3/20/2025 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres.) Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 3/27/25 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres. Arraignment set for 4/10/25 at 1:30pm before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres.) (Interpreter Daniel Novoa, Matias Pizarro). (CD# 3/17/2025 VET 25-1:3:26-3:50). (Plaintiff Attorney Adrian Henderson AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Julian Bugarin FD-S/A). (aje) [3:25-mj-01216-VET]
Related: [-]
4 4 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Dorotea Valeriano Martinez (no document attached) (aje) [3:25-mj-01216-VET]
Related: [-]
5 5 Oral MOTION to Detain (Flight) by USA as to Dorotea Valeriano Martinez. (no document attached) (aje) [3:25-mj-01216-VET]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER as to Dorotea Valeriano Martinez: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on 3/17/25. (aje) [3:25-mj-01216-VET]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Lynette M. Belsky appearing for Dorotea Valeriano Martinez (Belsky, Lynette)Attorney Lynette M. Belsky added to party Dorotea Valeriano Martinez(pty:dft) (exs). [3:25-mj-01216-VET]
Related: [-]
7 7 Notice of Assertion of Rights by Dorotea Valeriano Martinez (Belsky, Lynette) (exs). [3:25-mj-01216-VET]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Allison Rogge appearing for USA. (Rogge, Allison)Attorney Allison Rogge added to party USA(pty:pla) (exs). [3:25-mj-01216-VET]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
10 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres: Detention Hearing as to Dorotea Valeriano Martinez held on 3/20/2025. USA oral motion for detention 5 ; motion denied as to Dorotea Valeriano Martinez. Bond set as to Dorotea Valeriano Martinez (1) $20,000 P/S secured by 1FRA + 10% cash deposit. Defendant is ordered to participate in Location Monitoring (Home Detention); technology at the Pretrial Services Discretion. (Interpreter Alejandro Rodriguez). (CD# 3/20/2025 VET 25 9:47-9:55). (Plaintiff Attorney Adrian Henderson, AUSA S/A). (Defendant Attorney Lynette Belsky, FD). (no document attached) (bas1) [3:25-mj-01216-VET]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Dorotea Valeriano Martinez (1) $20,000 P/S secured by 1FRA + 10% cash deposit. Travel extended to the Central District of California. Defendant is ordered to participate in Location Monitoring (Home Detention); technology at the discretion of Pretrial Services. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on 03/20/2025. (bas1) [3:25-mj-01216-VET]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
15 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres: Preliminary Hearing not held as to Dorotea Valeriano Martinez. Defense oral motion to continue hearing; granted. Preliminary Hearing continued to 4/10/2025 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres. (Interpreter Elizabeth Valera). (CD# 3/27/2025 VET 25 1:37-1:44). (Plaintiff Attorney Tyler Bramlet, AUSA S/A). (Defendant Attorney Lynette Belsky, FD). (bas1) [3:25-mj-01216-VET]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
12 12 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendant Dorotea Valeriano Martinez. Per defense counsel request, Arraignment/Change of Plea/Sentence Without PSR set for 4/1/2025 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres. (no document attached) (bas1) [3:25-mj-01216-VET]
Related: [-]
13 13 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Chan, Kaley)Attorney Kaley Schall Chan added to party USA(pty:pla) (axi). [3:25-mj-01216-VET]
Related: [-]
14 14 NOTICE of Lodgment of Plea Agreement by USA (Chan, Kaley) (axi). [3:25-mj-01216-VET]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
16 16 INFORMATION as to Dorotea Valeriano Martinez (1) count(s) 1, 2. (bas1)
Related: [-]
17 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres: Arraignment on Information as to Dorotea Valeriano Martinez (1) Counts 1, 2 held on 4/1/2025. Not Guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Change of Plea Hearing as to Dorotea Valeriano Martinez held on 4/1/2025. Plea entered by Dorotea Valeriano Martinez (1) Guilty Count 1 of the Information. PSR Waived. All pending motions withdrawn. Pending hearing dates vacated. Sentence Without PSR Hearing held on 4/1/2025 for Dorotea Valeriano Martinez (1), Count(s) 1: CBOP for Time Served. $10.00 S.A - remitted. No Fine. Appeal rights waived.; Count(s) 2: Government oral motion to dismiss underlying counts without prejudice - granted. Judge update in case as to Dorotea Valeriano Martinez. Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres added to the case. Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz is no longer assigned to case and Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres is now assigned to the case. The new case number is 25-cr-01022-VET. (Interpreter Cynthia Herber). (CD# 4/1/2025 VET 25 2:46-3:04). (Plaintiff Attorney Jaqueline Jimenez, AUSA S/A). (Defendant Attorney Lynette Belsky, FD). (bas1)
Related: [-]
18 18 PLEA AGREEMENT as to Dorotea Valeriano Martinez (bas1)
Related: [-]
19 19 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Dorotea Valeriano Martinez. (bas1)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USM Read Receipt