California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:25-cr-00996
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 03, 2025 12:36 AM PDT
Defendant
Leonel Vitervo-Galvez (1)
Represented By
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Carmen Rivera
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Anna Sebastian
Doj-Usao
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/03/2025 3:43 AM PDT
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
Arrest of Leonel Vitervo-Galvez (no document attached) (ccc) [2:25-mj-08160-LR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Leonel Vitervo-Galvez. (Copies provided to Counsel in Court). Initial Appearance set for 3/5/2025 in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr. Preliminary Hearing set for 3/18/2025 10:00 AM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr. Arraignment set for 4/1/2025 10:00 AM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr. (ccc) (ccc). [2:25-mj-08160-LR]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/6/2025) Rap Sheet
2 2 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Anna Sebastian appearing for USA. (Sebastian, Anna)Attorney Anna Sebastian added to party USA(pty:pla) (axi). [2:25-mj-08160-LR]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORAL MOTION to Detain by USA as to Leonel Vitervo-Galvez. (no document attached) (ccc) [2:25-mj-08160-LR]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr: Initial Appearance as to Leonel Vitervo-Galvez held on 3/5/2025. Oral financial proffer submitted. Written Brady order filed. Attorney Federal Defenders for Leonel Vitervo-Galvez provisionally appointed. Financial affidavit due on 3/10/2025. Preliminary Hearing set for 3/18/2025 10:00 AM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr. Arraignment set for 4/1/2025 10:00 AM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr. Government oral motion for detention, risk of flight. Detention Hearing - RF set for 3/10/2025 01:00 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr. As required by Rule 5(f), the US is ordered to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges and contempt proceedings.(Interpreter Maria Cruz). (CD# 3/5/2025 LR 11:45-12:02). (Plaintiff Attorney Anna Sebastian S/A). (Defendant Attorney James Johnson S/A). (ccc) [2:25-mj-08160-LR]
Related: [-]
5 5 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Leonel Vitervo-Galvez (no document attached) (ccc) [2:25-mj-08160-LR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Carmen Rivera appearing for Leonel Vitervo-Galvez (Rivera, Carmen)Attorney Carmen Rivera added to party Leonel Vitervo-Galvez(pty:dft) (yxc). [2:25-mj-08160-LR]
Related: [-]
7 7 Notice of Assertion of Rights by Leonel Vitervo-Galvez (Rivera, Carmen)(axc1). [2:25-mj-08160-LR]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
8 8 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Leonel Vitervo-Galvez. (aum) [2:25-mj-08160-LR]
Related: [-]
9 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr:Detention Hearing as to Leonel Vitervo-Galvez held on 3/10/2025. USA oral motion for detention; motion denied as to Leonel Vitervo-Galvez. Preliminary Hearing not held as to Leonel Vitervo-Galvez. Defense oral motion to continue hearing granted. Preliminary Hearing continued to 4/1/2025 at 10:00 AM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr. Financial Affidavit submitted; Court confirms appointment of counsel; PROV Flag cleared.; Bond set as to Leonel Vitervo-Galvez (1) $25,000 P/S secured by 1 financially responsible and related adult with 10% deposit. (Interpreter Maria Cruz). (CD# 3/10/2025 LR 25 1:24-1:37). (Plaintiff Attorney Anna Sebastian). (Defendant Attorney S/A James Johnson). (no document attached) (vyc) [2:25-mj-08160-LR]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Leonel Vitervo-Galvez (1) $25,000 P/S secured by 1 financially responsible and related adult with 10% cash deposit, and home detention-GPS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 3/10/25. (aum) [2:25-mj-08160-LR]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
11 11 P/S Bond Filed as to Leonel Vitervo-Galvez in amount of $ 25,000.00, Receipt # 85702, 85703, 85704. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 3/18/25. (Document applicable to USA, Leonel Vitervo-Galvez.) (aum) [2:25-mj-08160-LR]
Related: [-]
12 12 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Leonel Vitervo-Galvez re11 Bond. (aum) [2:25-mj-08160-LR]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
13 13 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Leonel Vitervo-Galvez. (Rivera, Carmen) (axi). [2:25-mj-08160-LR]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
14 14 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA INFO (Sebastian, Anna) (axi). [2:25-mj-08160-LR]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
15 15 INFORMATION as to Leonel Vitervo-Galvez (1) count(s) 1, 2. (vyc)
Related: [-]
16 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr: Arraignment on Information as to Leonel Vitervo-Galvez (1) Count 1,2 held on 4/1/2025. Not Guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 5/16/2025 09:00 AM before District Judge James E. Simmons Jr. Motion to Modify Conditions of Release granted. (Interpreter Maria Cruz). (CD# 4/1/2025 LR:25-10:13-10:29). (Plaintiff Attorney Anna Sebastian). (Defendant Attorney James Johnson). (tar)
Related: [-]
17 17 MODIFIED PRETRIAL RELEASE ORDER as to Leonel Vitervo-Galvez (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 4/1/2025. (maq)
Related: [-]