Case Filed:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 03, 2025 3:15 AM EDT
Defendant
Richard Sevear Greene (1)
Represented By
Rhett Johnson
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Emily M. Jones
Federal Public Defenders Western District North Carolina
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
David Andrew Thorneloe
Office Of The U.S. Attorney--Wdnc
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/03/2025 4:48 AM EDT
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence (3:24-mc-104). Click on this link to retrieve the Standing Order (smm) [1:25-mj-00014-WCM]
Related: [-]
Case sealed as to Richard Sevear Greene. (kby) [1:25-mj-00014-WCM]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Richard Sevear Greene (1). (smm) [1:25-mj-00014-WCM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued (Sealed - Case Participants) by US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf in case as to Richard Sevear Greene. (smm) [1:25-mj-00014-WCM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Warrant Page Identifier
3 3 SEALED MOTION (Sealed - Attorney) Seal Complaint (available to: USA) (Thorneloe, David) [1:25-mj-00014-WCM]
Related: [-]
4 4 SEALED ORDER (Sealed - Attorney) as to Richard Sevear Greene re: 3 Sealed Motion. Signed by US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 3/26/2025. (kby) [1:25-mj-00014-WCM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
Arrest of Richard Sevear Greene. (slm) [1:25-mj-00014-WCM]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Richard Sevear Greene: Initial Appearance set for 3/28/2025 10:20 AM in Courtroom 2, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (slm) [1:25-mj-00014-WCM]
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Richard Sevear Greene. (slm) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/28/2025) (maf). [1:25-mj-00014-WCM]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
Minute Entry: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Richard Sevear Greene held before US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Defendant advised of rights & charges. Defendant moved for appointment of counsel. Defendant filed a financial affidavit. Court approved appointment of counsel. Court appointed Rhett Johson as counsel for the Defendant. Government moved for detention. Defendant waived detention and preliminary hearing. Defendant detained pending trial. Government's attorney: Annabelle Chambers. Defense attorney: Rhett Johnson. Court Reporter: Digital Court Reporter. (sc) [1:25-mj-00014-WCM]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER as to Richard Sevear Greene granting Oral Motion to Appoint Counsel. Court Appointed Rhett Johnson as counsel for Defendant. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 3/28/2025. (sc) [1:25-mj-00014-WCM]
Related: [-]
Attorney update in case as to Richard Sevear Greene. Attorney Rhett Johnson for Richard Sevear Greene added. (sc) [1:25-mj-00014-WCM]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER TO UNSEAL: The 5 Motion to Unseal Documents as to Richard Sevear Greene is GRANTED. Signed by US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 3/28/2025. (maf) [1:25-mj-00014-WCM]
Related: [-]
7 7 CJA 23 (Ex Parte) Financial Affidavit by Richard Sevear Greene. (sc) [1:25-mj-00014-WCM]
Related: [-]
8 8 WAIVER of Detention Hearing/Continuance Request by Richard Sevear Greene. (sc) [1:25-mj-00014-WCM]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER Re: 8 Waiver of Detention Hearing/Continuance Request as to Richard Sevear Greene. Signed by US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 3/28/2025. (sc) [1:25-mj-00014-WCM]
Related: [-]
10 10 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Richard Sevear Greene. (sc) [1:25-mj-00014-WCM]
Related: [-]
11 11 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 3/27/2025 in case as to Richard Sevear Greene. (smm) [1:25-mj-00014-WCM]
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 30, 2025
14 14 Notice of Substitution of Counsel in case as to Richard Sevear Greene. Attorney Emily M. Jones added. Attorney Rhett Johnson terminated. (Jones, Emily) [1:25-mj-00014-WCM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
15 15 PRETRIAL REPORT (SEALED - Attorney) as to Richard Sevear Greene (available to USA, Richard Sevear Greene) (Brannon Curtis - sb) [1:25-mj-00014-WCM]
Related: [-]
16 16 INDICTMENT as to Richard Sevear Greene (1): count(s) 1. (sc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted Signature Page,
Att: 2 Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Penalty Sheet