Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:25-mj-01422
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 03, 2025 3:38 AM CDT
Defendant
Kelvin Sauceda-Reyes (1)
Represented By
Joseph D. Vasquez
Law Offices Of Joseph D. Vasquez
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Lori Hughes
Doj-Usao
contact info
Duty AUSA-El Paso
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/03/2025 4:17 AM CDT
Sunday, March 30, 2025
Arrest of Kelvin Sauceda-Reyes (ll)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Kelvin Sauceda-Reyes by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (ll)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda as to Kelvin Sauceda-Reyes. (ll)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Kelvin Sauceda-Reyes. (ll)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING Joseph D. Vasquez as COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (ll)
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert F. Castaneda:Initial Appearance as to Kelvin Sauceda-Reyes held on 4/1/2025 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required (T. Saenz). (Court Reporter ERO.) (ll)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARING as to Kelvin Sauceda-Reyes, (Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 4/4/2025 09:30 AM before Judge Robert F. Castaneda) Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (ll)
Related: [-]