Ohio Northern District Court
Case #: 3:25-cr-00155
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 03, 2025 3:19 AM EDT
Defendant
Seth Jacob Schwerin (1)
Represented By
Christopher R. Bucio
Bucio Law - Sidney
contact info
James J. Popil
Law Office Of James J. Popil
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
James L. Morford
Office Of The U.S. Attorney - Cleveland
contact info
Tracey Ballard Tangeman
Office Of The U.S. Attorney - Toledo
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/03/2025 4:52 AM EDT
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
1 1 Complaint filed by USA as to Seth Jacob Schwerin (1) signed by Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 3/5/2025. (R,Ke) Modified to seal on 3/11/2025 (R,Ke). [3:25-mj-05080-DAC]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit UNDER SEAL. See
Att: 5 Redacted Affidavit
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
Arrest of Seth Jacob Schwerin (1) on 3/11/2025. (R,Ke) [3:25-mj-05080-DAC]
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to Seth Jacob Schwerin (1). (R,Ke) [3:25-mj-05080-DAC]
Related: [-]
Scheduling Order [non-document] as to Seth Jacob Schwerin (1). Initial Appearance set for 3/12/2025 at 10:00 AM to be held by video conference. Video conference access information will be provided to all participants in advance. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 3/11/2025. (R,Ke) [3:25-mj-05080-DAC]
Related: [-]
3 3 Motion to Seal Complaint by United States of America as to Seth Jacob Schwerin (1).(R,Ke) [3:25-mj-05080-DAC]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
4 4 Order granting in part and denying in part USA's3 Motion to Seal Complaint as to Seth Jacob Schwerin (1). The affidavit in support of the complaint only to remain sealed. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 3/11/2025. (R,Ke) [3:25-mj-05080-DAC]
Related: [-]
5 5 Redacted Affidavit in support of1 Complaint by United States of America as to Seth Jacob Schwerin. (R,Ke) [3:25-mj-05080-DAC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
Scheduling Order [non-document] as to Seth Jacob Schwerin (1). Initial Appearance RESET for 3/13/2025 at 01:00 PM to be held by video conference. Video conference access information will be provided to all participants in advance. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 3/12/2025. (S,DM) [3:25-mj-05080-DAC]
Related: [-]
7 7 Notice of Appearance of Attorney - Christopher R. Bucio appearing for Seth Jacob Schwerin (1) (Bucio, Christopher) [3:25-mj-05080-DAC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. Initial Appearance as to Seth Jacob Schwerin (1) held on 3/13/2025. Government appeared by AUSA Tracey Tangeman; Defendant appeared with attorney Christopher R. Bucio; Officer Tia Lang appeared for U.S. Pretrial Services. All participants consented to appear via audio/video conference. Charges read. Parties advised of the Due Process Protections Act. Government moved for detention. Combined Preliminary/Detention hearing set for 3/25/2025 10:30 AM in courtroom 1B before Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. Defendant ordered temporarily detained. (Court Reporter J. Hancock) Time: 13 minutes. (S,DM) [3:25-mj-05080-DAC]
Related: [-]
Order [non-document] as to Seth Jacob Schwerin (1). Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, Government's counsel is advised of and ordered to comply with the government's disclosure requirements under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny; and reminded that failure to comply with those disclosure obligations in timely manner could result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, or sanctions by the Court. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 3/13/2025. (S,DM) [3:25-mj-05080-DAC]
Related: [-]
8 8 Temporary Order of Detention as to Seth Jacob Schwerin (1). Combined Preliminary/Detention hearing set for 3/25/2025 10:30 AM in courtroom 1B. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 3/13/2025. (S,DM) [3:25-mj-05080-DAC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
9 9 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 3/11/2025 in case as to Seth Jacob Schwerin (1). (S,DM) [3:25-mj-05080-DAC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. The matter convened for a combined Preliminary/Detention Hearing as to Seth Jacob Schwerin (1) on 3/25/2025. Government appeared by AUSA Tracey Tangeman; Defendant appeared with attorney Christopher R. Bucio. Charges read. Defendant waived preliminary hearing and the matter is bound over to the grand jury. Defendant and Government proffered certain evidence. Testimony received from Special Agent Anthony Safford, HSI. Argument held. The Court directs Pretrial Services to submit a supplemental report. The Court takes the matter under advisement. Government moved for a no contact order with the alleged minor victim, B.G. Order to issue. (Court Reporter ECRO G. Gomula) Time: 1 hour, 41 minutes. (R,Ke) [3:25-mj-05080-DAC]
Related: [-]
10 10 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing by Seth Jacob Schwerin (1). (R,Ke) [3:25-mj-05080-DAC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
11 11 Proposed Release conditions by Seth Jacob Schwerin (1). (Bucio, Christopher) Modified text, termed motion on 3/26/2025 (R,Ke). [3:25-mj-05080-DAC]
Related: [-]
12 12 No Contact Order as to Seth Jacob Schwerin (1). Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 3/26/2025. (R,Ke) [3:25-mj-05080-DAC]
Related: [-]
14 14 Order of Detention as to Seth Jacob Schwerin (1). Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 3/26/2025. (R,Ke) [3:25-mj-05080-DAC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
15 15 Notice of Discovery Request as to Seth Jacob Schwerin (1) (Bucio, Christopher) [3:25-mj-05080-DAC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 57.9. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (W,CM)
Related: [-]
16 16 Indictment filed by USA as to Seth Jacob Schwerin (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3. (W,CM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Designation Form,
Att: 2 Signature Page