California Northern District Court
Judge:Kandis A Westmore
Case #: 4:25-cv-02991
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 03, 2025 1:45 AM PDT
Defendant
Llewellyn Rossbacher
Plaintiff
Alma Marina Heyman
230 Cabrillo Hwy South Room 220
Half Moon Bay, CA 94019


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
4 4 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Mon 04/21 8:23 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 5/5/2025. (ccf, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
3 3 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 04/02 8:19 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/24/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/1/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (jml, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 04/02 8:16 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Alma Marina Heyman. (jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/02 8:15 AM
COMPLAINT against Llewellyn Rossbacher. Filed by Alma Marina Heyman. Consent/Declination due by 4/15/2025.(jml, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet