New York Southern District Court
Judge:Paul A Engelmayer
Case #: 1:25-cv-02774
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause42:12132 Americans with Disabilities Act - Discrimination
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 18, 2025 5:52 AM EDT
Defendant
Lisa Bova-Hiatt
in her official capacity as Chief Executive Officer of the New York City Housing Authority 250 Broadway or
90 Church Street, NY 10007
Represented By
Andrew Michael Lupin
New York City Housing Authority
contact info
Defendant
New York City Housing Authority
90 Church Street
New York, NY 10007
Represented By
Andrew Michael Lupin
New York City Housing Authority
contact info
Defendant
Jamie Rubin
in his official capacity as Board Chair of the New York City Housing Authority 90 Church Street
New York, NY 10007
Represented By
Andrew Michael Lupin
New York City Housing Authority
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan Bourne
132 Kramer Street Apt. 4A
Staten Island, NY 10305
Represented By
Robert Dwayne Sanderman
Staten Island Legal Services
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 05/19 12:04 PM
ORDER granting19 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/19/2025) Lisa Bova-Hiatt answer due 6/20/2025; New York City Housing Authority answer due 6/20/2025; Jamie Rubin answer due 6/20/2025 (ar)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 05/16 4:40 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Andrew M. Lupin dated May 16, 2025. Document filed by Lisa Bova-Hiatt, New York City Housing Authority, Jamie Rubin..(Lupin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/16 4:35 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Michael Lupin on behalf of Lisa Bova-Hiatt, New York City Housing Authority, Jamie Rubin..(Lupin, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
17 17 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Wed 05/14 1:57 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. All Defendants. Service was accepted by C. Stokes. Document filed by Susan Bourne..(Sanderman, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
16 16 service Summons Issued Fri 04/18 3:04 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Housing Authority. (vf)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Issued Fri 04/18 3:04 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lisa Bova-Hiatt. (vf)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Issued Fri 04/18 3:03 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jamie Rubin. (vf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
13 13 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 04/17 9:34 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Housing Authority, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Susan Bourne..(Sanderman, Robert)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 04/17 9:33 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lisa Bova-Hiatt, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Susan Bourne..(Sanderman, Robert)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 04/17 9:32 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jamie Rubin, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Susan Bourne..(Sanderman, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 04/16 4:00 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Robert Dwayne Sanderman to RE-FILE Document No. 9 Request for Issuance of Summons, 10 Request for Issuance of Summons, 8 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; caption error, all parties must be listed in caption. If all names do not fit in the space provided, name the first listed Defendant on the pleading followed by 'et al'. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
10 10 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/15 3:25 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Housing Authority, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Susan Bourne..(Sanderman, Robert)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/15 3:23 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lisa Bova-Hiatt, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Susan Bourne..(Sanderman, Robert)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 04/15 3:20 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jamie Rubin, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Susan Bourne..(Sanderman, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 04/14 3:48 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Robert Dwayne Sanderman to RE-FILE Document No. 6 Request for Issuance of Summons, 5 Request for Issuance of Summons, 7 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Caption title for each summons must be the same and list each defendant;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 04/11 10:00 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Housing Authority, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Susan Bourne..(Sanderman, Robert)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 04/11 9:58 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lisa Bova-Hiatt, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Susan Bourne..(Sanderman, Robert)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 04/11 9:56 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jamie Rubin, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Susan Bourne..(Sanderman, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
4 4 1 pgs order Order Granting IFP Application Tue 04/08 4:00 PM
ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. § 1915. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 4/8/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
3 3 misc Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 04/04 1:20 PM
REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Susan Bourne..(Sanderman, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 04/04 1:16 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sanderman, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 04/04 10:33 AM
COMPLAINT against Lisa Bova-Hiatt, New York City Housing Authority, Jamie Rubin. Document filed by Susan Bourne..(Sanderman, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-January 7, 2019 Discharge Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Modification Request,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-August 29, 2024 Demand Letter
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Fri 04/04 1:07 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert Dwayne Sanderman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Susan Bourne, Jamie Rubin, Lisa Bova-Hiatt. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (sj)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet Fri 04/04 1:08 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Robert Dwayne Sanderman. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
Related: [-]
misc Case Opening Fee Due Fri 04/04 1:11 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO PAY THE FILING FEE. Notice to Attorney Robert Dwayne Sanderman. Civil Case Opening Fee of Due: for1 Complaint. The filing fee due was not paid; either in whole or in part. If the filing fee is not paid within five (5) days, per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-131, this case will be administratively closed. Filing Fee due by 4/9/2025. (sj)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 04/04 4:02 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 04/04 4:03 PM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 04/04 4:04 PM
Case Designated ECF. (sj)
Related: [-]