North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Max O Cogburn, Jr
Referred: David Keesler
Case #: 3:25-cv-00235
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 18, 2025 6:00 AM EDT
Defendant
Bank of America, N.A.
McGuireWoods LLP 201 N Tryon St Suite 3000 c/o Michael Mestre
Charlotte, NC 28202
Represented By
Michael Sterling Mestre
Mcguirewoods - Charlotte
contact info
Plaintiff
Antoine Scott
4509 Morgan Street
Charlotte, NC 28208


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
6 6 2 pgs order Order Setting Response Deadline Mon 05/12 10:16 AM
ROSEBORO ORDER Setting Response Deadline re: 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Memorandum in Support. Response due by 5/27/2025. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 5/12/2025. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ams)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
5 5 motion Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim Thu 05/08 11:26 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Memorandum in Support by Bank of America, N.A.. Responses due by 5/22/2025 (Mestre, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 04/09 3:00 PM
ORDER granting with modification Defendant's 3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint contained in the Notice of Removal. Bank of America, N.A. answer due 5/9/2025. Signed by US Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/9/25. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Extension of Time Wed 04/09 1:25 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re:1 Notice of Removal, Plaintiff's Complaint by Bank of America, N.A.. (Mestre, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 04, 2025
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 04/04 1:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, N.A.. (Mestre, Michael)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 04/04 11:40 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and US Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (mdp)
Related: [-]
utility Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence Fri 04/04 11:44 AM
Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence (3:24-mc-104). Click on this link to retrieve the Standing Order (mdp)
Related: [-]
order Order of Instructions Fri 04/04 12:01 PM
Standing Order of Instructions Regarding Pro Se Litigants in Civil Actions. Click on this link to retrieve the Standing Order. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 04/04/2025. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mdp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 04/03 10:34 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for Mecklenburg County, NC, case number 25CV009652-590. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCWDC-6914384), filed by Bank of America, N.A..(Mestre, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings,
Att: 2 Cover Sheet