4
|
|
4
service
Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Fri 05/02 6:35 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/4/2025. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/3/2025.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/28/2025., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JORGAN K. ANDREWS served on 4/10/2025; JENNIFER LARSON served on 4/10/2025; MARCO RUBIO served on 4/28/2025 (Goldstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
order
.Order
Thu 04/03 1:55 PM
ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 04/03/2025. (lcckk1)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Thu 04/03 1:25 PM
SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(znmw)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice and Consent
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Thu 04/03 12:22 PM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS AND COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11588070) filed by ABHIJEET SHINDE.(Goldstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet,
|
| |
Att: 2
Summons,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit A,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit B,
|
| |
Att: 5
Exhibit C,
|
| |
Att: 6
Exhibit D,
|
| |
Att: 7
Exhibit E
|
|
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 04/03 1:23 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (znmw)
Related: [-]
|