Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Darrel James Papillion
Referred: Karen Wells Roby
Case #: 2:25-cv-00643
Nature of Suit340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine
Cause46:30504 Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 03, 2025 11:06 AM CDT
Plaintiff
In the Matter of the Complaint of K&K Marine, LLC as Owner of the Vessel M/V T-Ray for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
12 12 3 pgs order Order Mon 04/28 4:41 PM
ORDER Approving Declaration of Value and Ad Interim Stipulation, Directing Issuance of Notice to Claimants, and Restricting Prosecution of Claims. Signed by Judge Darrel James Papillion on 4/25/2025.(lag)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Deposit Funds Tue 04/22 10:50 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion to Deposit $250.00 into the Registry of the Court in Lieu of a Cost Bond. Signed by Judge Darrel James Papillion on 04/22/2025. (NEF: Financial) (ko)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
10 10 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Fri 04/04 11:03 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re7 Notice (Other),2 Declaration,4 Notice (Other),3 Stipulation,6 Notice (Other): Documents were incorrectly filed as separate documents instead of as attachments to document 1. Clerk took corrective action. No further action is necessary. (ko)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
9 9 misc Initial Case Assignment Thu 04/03 11:57 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Darrel James Papillion and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cc)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Thu 04/03 11:50 AM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by In the Matter of the Complaint of K&K Marine, LLC as Owner of the Vessel M/V T-Ray for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability identifying Corporate Parent K&K Marine, LLC for In the Matter of the Complaint of K&K Marine, LLC as Owner of the Vessel M/V T-Ray for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability (Meche, Alan)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/03 11:46 AM
NOTICE by In the Matter of the Complaint of K&K Marine, LLC as Owner of the Vessel M/V T-Ray for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability proposed Order Approving Complainants' Declaration of Valuation And Ad Interim Stipulation and Directing Issuance of Notice to Claimants and Restricting Prosecution of Claims . (Meche, Alan)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/03 11:43 AM
NOTICE by In the Matter of the Complaint of K&K Marine, LLC as Owner of the Vessel M/V T-Ray for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability Notice to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability . (Meche, Alan)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Deposit Funds Thu 04/03 11:40 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Deposit Funds $250.00 Into Registry of Court in Lieu of Cost Bond by In the Matter of the Complaint of K&K Marine, LLC as Owner of the Vessel M/V T-Ray for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability.(Meche, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/03 11:38 AM
NOTICE by In the Matter of the Complaint of K&K Marine, LLC as Owner of the Vessel M/V T-Ray for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability Security Under Rule F and Other Supplemental Rules of Certain Admiralty and Maritime Claims .(Meche, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter of Undertaking
3 3 misc Stipulation Thu 04/03 11:31 AM
STIPULATION by In the Matter of the Complaint of K&K Marine, LLC as Owner of the Vessel M/V T-Ray for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability re1 Complaint,, (Meche, Alan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration Thu 04/03 11:27 AM
Declaration by In the Matter of the Complaint of K&K Marine, LLC as Owner of the Vessel M/V T-Ray for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability(Meche, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A -Survey
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/03 11:24 AM
COMPLAINT against In the Matter of the Complaint of K&K Marine, LLC as Owner of the Vessel M/V T-Ray for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10946997) filed by In the Matter of the Complaint of K&K Marine, LLC as Owner of the Vessel M/V T-Ray for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability.Attorney Alan J. Meche added to party In the Matter of the Complaint of K&K Marine, LLC as Owner of the Vessel M/V T-Ray for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability(pty:pla).(Meche, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Verification of Alan J. Meche,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet