Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:25-bk-11828

Maryland Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michelle M Harner
Case #: 1:25-ap-00085
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Mariner Finance, LLC, Defendant
8211 Town Center Drive
Baltimore, MD 21236
Represented By
Mariner Finance, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles Joseph Wise, Plaintiff
2905 Auden Court
Abingdon, MD 21009
Represented By
Heather L. Dickerson
Heather Dickreson
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 04/08 12:10 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Charles Joseph Wise. (Dickerson, Heather)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 04/08 9:10 AM
Adversary Case 1:25-ap-85 Closed. (Aure, Lia)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 06, 2025
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - AP (Auto-Docket) Mon 04/07 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/06/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Friday, April 04, 2025
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 04/04 12:24 PM
Summons Issued on Mariner Finance, LLC Date Issued 4/4/2025, Answer Due 5/5/2025 Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 05/22/2025 at 02:00 PM. Virtual hearing - For hearing access information see www.mdb.uscourts.gov/hearings or call 410-962-2688. (Aure, Lia)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles Joseph Wise
Thursday, April 03, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint (Case Opening) Thu 04/03 10:43 AM
Adversary case 25-00085 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Heather L. Dickerson on behalf of Charles Joseph Wise against Mariner Finance, LLC. The filing fee is EXEMPT - Plaintiff is the debtor in the Bankruptcy case. (Dickerson, Heather)
Related: [-]