Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-43993

New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Elizabeth S Stong
Case #: 1:25-ap-01035
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Blake Holden
375 Park Place
Brooklyn, NY 11238
Represented By
Blake Holden
contact info
Plaintiff
Swift Financial, LLC as servicing agent for WebBank
2211 North First Street
San Jose, CA 95131
Represented By
Sergio I Scuteri
Capehart & Scatchard PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
5 5 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Thu 05/01 2:06 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Sergio I Scuteri on behalf of Swift Financial, LLC as servicing agent for WebBank Related [+] (Scuteri, Sergio)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Swift Financial, LLC as servicing agent for WebBank,4 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Friday, April 04, 2025
4 4 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto) Fri 04/04 2:13 PM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office against Blake Holden Answer Due: 5/5/2025 Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/23/2025 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (nwh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
3 3 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Thu 04/03 11:36 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Sergio I Scuteri on behalf of Swift Financial, LLC, as servicing agent for WebBank (Scuteri, Sergio)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Thu 04/03 11:25 AM
Adversary Cover Sheet Filed by Sergio I Scuteri on behalf of Swift Financial, LLC, as servicing agent for WebBank (Scuteri, Sergio)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 04/03 10:36 AM
Adversary case 1 25-01035 Complaint by Swift Financial, LLC, as servicing agent for WebBank against Blake Holden. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)), (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)). (Scuteri, Sergio)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B