Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-12582

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kimberley H Tyson
Case #: 1:25-ap-01112
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Mountain Peak Law Group, P.C.
Represented By
Mountain Peak Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
KINO Financial Co., LLC
Represented By
KINO Financial Co., LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Harvey Sender
Represented By
Katharine S. Sender
Allen Vellone Wolf Helfrich & Factor P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 05/14 7:27 AM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 25-01112 KHT. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 5/28/2025. (td)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (Awaiting Answer) Tue 05/13 4:52 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Katharine S. Sender on behalf of Harvey Sender Related [+]. (Sender, Katharine)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
8 8 utility Notification of Electronic Filing Error (Public Entry) Tue 05/13 11:37 AM
Notice of Electronic Filing Error. Katharine S. Sender is hereby notified of the following error in docket number 7: Incorrect event . E-Filer shall refile the pleading using the Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (Awaiting Answer). Failure to timely correct the error may result in the party not receiving the requested relief. (Text Only Entry) Related [+]. Review for status Date 5/15/2025. (rxc)
Related: [-] 7 Notice
Thursday, May 08, 2025
7 7 notice Notice Thu 05/08 4:22 PM
Notice Re: Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding. Filed by Katharine S. Sender on behalf of Harvey Sender. (Sender, Katharine)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
6 6 order Abeyance Fri 04/18 11:38 AM
Order Regarding Motion To Hold Adversary Proceeding In Abeyance And Notice Of Settlement. Related [+]. Document due by 6/14/2025 (td)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Hold Case In Abeyance
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
5 5 motion Abeyance Tue 04/15 4:13 PM
Motion To Hold Case In Abeyance Filed by Katharine S. Sender on behalf of Harvey Sender. (Sender, Katharine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Wed 04/02 2:38 PM
Summons Service Executed On: Mountain Peak Law Group, P.C. and KINO Financial Co., LLC on 04/02/2025 Filed by Katharine S. Sender on behalf of Harvey Sender. (Sender, Katharine)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Notice of Deferral of Adversary Filing Fee Wed 04/02 1:52 PM
The trustee or debtor-in-possession commencing this proceeding having requested deferral of the filing fee pursuant to paragraph (6) of the Bankruptcy Court Miscellaneous Fee Schedule, the request is hereby GRANTED and the filing fee shall be payable only from the estate and to the extent there is any estate realized. (Admin)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 04/02 1:49 PM
Summons Issued on KINO Financial Co., LLC Answer Due 05/2/2025; Mountain Peak Law Group, P.C. Answer Due 05/2/2025. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Sender, Katharine)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/02 1:47 PM
Adversary case 25-01112 Complaint by Harvey Sender against Mountain Peak Law Group, P.C., KINO Financial Co., LLC. Fee to be Deferred. Adversary Status Deadline 07/1/2025 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Sender, Katharine)
Related: [-]