Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:David S Cercone
Case #: 2:25-cv-00460
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 03, 2025 4:08 PM EDT
Defendant
WHITESTONE HOME FURNISHINGS, LLC
Plaintiff
BLAIR DOUGLASS
Represented By
Stephanie Moore
East End Trial Group
contact info
Helen Chandler Steiger
East End Trial Group LLC
contact info
Kevin W. Tucker
East End Trial Group LLC
contact info
Kevin Abramowicz
East End Trial Group, LLC
contact info
Kayla Conahan
East End Trial Group LLC
contact info
Jessica Liu
East End Trial Group LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/02 4:54 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion for John C. Ochoa to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 5/2/2025. (lyk)
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/02 4:53 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Molly A. Arranz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 5/2/2025. (lyk)
Related: [-]
13 13 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 05/02 3:37 PM
ORDER granting9 MOTION to Certify Class For Settlement Purposes, MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by BLAIR DOUGLASS. Final Approval Hearing set for Thursday, September 11,2025 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 7A before Judge David S. Cercone. Details more fully stated in Order. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 5/2/2025. (lyk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required) Thu 04/17 2:06 PM
MOTION for attorney John C. Ochoa to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-8818816) by WHITESTONE HOME FURNISHINGS, LLC. (Ochoa, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit for PHV Admission,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - (ARDC_Good_Standing_Letter),
Att: 3 Proposed Order
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required) Thu 04/17 1:59 PM
MOTION for attorney Molly A. Arranz to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-8818785) by WHITESTONE HOME FURNISHINGS, LLC. (Arranz, Molly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit for PHV Admission,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - (ARDC_Good_Standing_Letter),
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
10 10 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 04/08 5:07 PM
BRIEF in Support re9 Motion to Certify Class,, Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by BLAIR DOUGLASS. (Tucker, Kevin)
Related: [-]
9 9 6 pgs motion Certify Class Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies) Tue 04/08 5:06 PM
MOTION to Certify Class For Settlement Purposes , MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by BLAIR DOUGLASS. (Tucker, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1. Case Action Settlement Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2. Proposed Notice Plan,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3. Plaintiff's Counsel's Resumes,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Friday, April 04, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/04 11:40 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kayla Conahan on behalf of BLAIR DOUGLASS. (Conahan, Kayla)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/04 11:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Liu on behalf of BLAIR DOUGLASS. (Liu, Jessica)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/04 10:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Moore on behalf of BLAIR DOUGLASS. (Moore, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 04/04 10:07 AM
NOTICE of Settlement as a Class Action by BLAIR DOUGLASS (Tucker, Kevin)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/04 10:05 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Helen Chandler Steiger on behalf of BLAIR DOUGLASS. (Steiger, Helen)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/04 10:05 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BLAIR DOUGLASS. WHITESTONE HOME FURNISHINGS, LLC waiver sent on 4/3/2025, answer due 6/2/2025. (Tucker, Kevin)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 04/04 8:49 AM
Summons Issued as to WHITESTONE HOME FURNISHINGS, LLC (ert)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Attorney added without signing any pleadings Fri 04/04 8:40 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 COMPLAINT. ERROR: Attorney added as counsel of record without signing any pleadings. CORRECTION: Attorney Helen Chandler Steiger, Jessica Liu, Kayla Conahan, Kevin Abramowicz, Stephanie Moore must file a Notice of Appearance. (ert)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 04/04 8:43 AM
Judge David S. Cercone added. (ert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
1 1 22 pgs cmp ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required) Thu 04/03 3:37 PM
COMPLAINT against WHITESTONE HOME FURNISHINGS, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8792340), filed by BLAIR DOUGLASS. (Tucker, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons