California Northern District Court
Judge:Araceli Martinez-Olguin
Case #: 3:25-cv-03053
Nature of Suit720 Labor - Labor/Management Relations
Cause29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2025
Case in other court:Contra Costa County Superior Court, C25-00449
Last checked: Thursday Apr 03, 2025 2:06 PM PDT
Defendant
MV Public Transportation, Inc.
Represented By
Michael William Nelson
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Defendant
MV Transportation, Inc.
Represented By
Michael William Nelson
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Defendant
Westcats
Plaintiff
Richard Ryan Oswald


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
11 11 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Wed 05/07 9:21 AM
Clerk's Notice on Reassignment. You are noticed that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Martinez-Olguin's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at[LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/martinez-olguin-araceli-amo/] . This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 8/7/2025 no later than 12:00 PM PST. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2025 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
10 10 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/07 8:47 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is directly assigned to Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin. Judge Edward M Chen no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See [LINK:General Order 65] and [LINK:cand.uscourts.gov/cameras] . Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order Relating Case Tue 04/29 1:38 PM
ORDER RELATING CASE. The Court has reviewed the motion and determined that Case No. 25-cv-696 AMO is related to Case No. 25-cv-3053 EMC. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on 4/29/2025. (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 04/17 10:04 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See [LINK:General Order 65] and [LINK:cand.uscourts.gov/cameras] . (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Thu 04/17 9:11 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 04/16 4:10 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Richard Ryan Oswald.. (Harrier, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
5 5 service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 04/04 1:17 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MV Transportation, Inc., MV Public Transportation, Inc. re 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,,2 Certificate of Interested Entities, 1 Notice of Removal, (Nelson, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 04/03 3:28 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 6/26/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/3/2025 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 04/03 2:19 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/17/2025. (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 04/03 1:53 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by MV Transportation, Inc., MV Public Transportation, Inc. (Nelson, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Contra Costa Superior Court. Their case number is C25-00449. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-20528094). Filed by MV Transportation, Inc., MV Public Transportation, Inc..(Nelson, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Michael Nelson ISO Removal,
Att: 2 Declaration of Thomas Bossaller ISO Removal,
Att: 3 Request for Judicial Notice ISO Removal,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 Answer to Removal Complaint by MV Transportation, Inc., MV Public Transportation, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]