Alabama Southern District Court
Judge:Sonja F Bivins
Case #: 2:25-cv-00130
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 03, 2025 5:05 PM CDT
Defendant
M&D Logging, Inc.
Defendant
James Keith Powell
Defendant
Timberland Resources, Inc.
Plaintiff
Great Lake Insurance SE
Represented By
Graham R. Pulvere
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 07, 2025
4 4 order Service Order Mon 04/07 1:01 PM
Service Order entered 4/7/2025. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 5/19/2025.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 04/07/2025. (srd)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 04/07 12:52 PM
Summons Issued as to M&D Logging, LLC, James Keith Powell, Timberland Resources, Inc.. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srd)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mon 04/07 11:53 AM
Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. (srd) (Main Document 2 replaced on 4/7/2025) (srd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Request for Reassignment
Friday, April 04, 2025
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 04/04 12:20 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Great Lake Insurance SE ( Filing fee $405 receipt number AALSDC-3602734, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Great Lake Insurance SE. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 7/3/2025. (Pulvere, Graham)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Summons - James Keith Powell,
Att: 5 Summons - M&D Logging,
Att: 6 Summons - Timberland Resources