Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Catherine D Perry
Case #: 4:25-cv-00435
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2025
Terminated:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Apr 03, 2025 5:06 PM CDT
Defendant
NodesNow, LLC
Plaintiff
TD Synnex Corporation
Represented By
Nicholas B. Clifford, Jr.
Tucker Ellis Llp - St. Louis
contact info

GPO Apr 07 2025
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that within seven (7) days of the date of this Order, plaintiff TD Synnex Corporation shall file an amended complaint that properly alleges this Court's subject-matter jurisdiction. Failure to timely comply with this Order may result in this action being dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by Sr. District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 4/7/2025. (NEP)

Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
6 6 order A Docket Text Order Mon 04/14 12:28 PM
Docket Text ORDER: re:5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TD Synnex Corporation (Clifford, Nicholas ); As set out in plaintiff's notice; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Sr. District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 04/14/2025. (KRZ)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 04/11 11:21 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TD Synnex Corporation (Clifford, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Memorandum & Order Mon 04/07 2:28 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that within seven (7) days of the date of this Order, plaintiff TD Synnex Corporation shall file an amended complaint that properly alleges this Court's subject-matter jurisdiction. Failure to timely comply with this Order may result in this action being dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by Sr. District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 4/7/2025. (NEP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Thu 04/03 2:43 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TD Synnex Corporation. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Clifford, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Notice of Process Server Thu 04/03 2:42 PM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff TD Synnex Corporation Process Server: Metro One Investigations (Clifford, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 04/03 2:40 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant TD Synnex Corporation with receipt number AMOEDC-11179649, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by TD Synnex Corporation.(Clifford, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Promissory Note,
Att: 2 Exhibit B UCC Financing Statement,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Original Filing Form,
Att: 5 Summons
misc Case Opening Notification Thu 04/03 3:36 PM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Catherine D. Perry. 1 Summons(es) issued and emailed to Nicholas B. Clifford, Jr.. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JBH)
Related: [-]