California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Neil W Bason
Case #: 2:25-bk-12772
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Yihe Forbes LLC, Debtor
122A E Foothill Blvd PMB NO.4
Arcadia, CA 91006-2505
Represented By
Richard T Baum
Richard T. Baum
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017
Represented By
Dare Law
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 minutes ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
27 27 court Hearing Set (Motion) (BK Case - BNC Option) Mon 04/21 11:27 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 5/20/2025 at 01:00 PM at Crtrm 1545, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Neil W. Bason (DG)
Related: [-] 19 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Yihe Forbes LLC
Sunday, April 20, 2025
26 26 misc Status Report for Chapter 11 Status Conference Sun 04/20 10:38 AM
Status Report for Chapter 11 Status Conference (Initial) Filed by Debtor Yihe Forbes LLC. (Baum, Richard)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 19, 2025
25 25 notice Notice of Hearing (BK Case) Sat 04/19 2:18 PM
Notice of Hearing Corrected Notice of Hearing of Application to Employ Counsel Filed by Debtor Yihe Forbes LLC Related [+]. (Baum, Richard)
Related: [-] 19 Application to Employ Richard T. Baum as Attorney for Debtor-in-Possession and Notice of Application Filed by Debtor Yihe Forbes LLC
Friday, April 18, 2025
24 24 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Fri 04/18 2:17 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect hearing date was selected. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO FILE AN AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION/HEARING WITH THE CORRECT HEARING INFORMATION. Related [+] (DG)
Related: [-] 23 Notice of Hearing (BK Case) filed by Debtor Yihe Forbes LLC
23 23 notice Notice of Hearing (BK Case) Fri 04/18 11:16 AM
Notice of Hearing of Application to Employ Richard T Baum as Attorney for Debtor-in-Possession Filed by Debtor Yihe Forbes LLC Related [+]. (Baum, Richard)
Related: [-] 19 Application to Employ Richard T. Baum as Attorney for Debtor-in-Possession and Notice of Application Filed by Debtor Yihe Forbes LLC
Thursday, April 17, 2025
22 22 answer Objection Thu 04/17 2:21 PM
Objection Related [+] Proof of Service Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (LA) (Law, Dare)
Related: [-] 19 Application to Employ Richard T. Baum as Attorney for Debtor-in-Possession and Notice of Application filed by Debtor Yihe Forbes LLC
21 21 misc Declaration Thu 04/17 11:58 AM
Declaration re: Supplemental Declaration of Richard T Baum in Support of Application for Employment as Counsel Filed by Debtor Yihe Forbes LLC Related [+]. (Baum, Richard)
Related: [-] 19 Application to Employ Richard T. Baum as Attorney for Debtor-in-Possession and Notice of Application
20 20 notice Notice Thu 04/17 11:56 AM
Notice of Unavailability of Counsel Filed by Debtor Yihe Forbes LLC. (Baum, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
19 19 26 pgs motion Employ (motion) Thu 04/10 10:48 AM
Application to Employ Richard T. Baum as Attorney for Debtor-in-Possession and Notice of Application Filed by Debtor Yihe Forbes LLC (Baum, Richard)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Notice of Change of Address Thu 04/10 8:49 AM
Notice of Change of Address Brooks and DeRensis Filed by Debtor Yihe Forbes LLC. (Baum, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 04/09 9:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order on Generic Application (BNC-PDF)
16 16 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Wed 04/09 3:29 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Other -PDF document was not flattened prior to filing. Instructions for flattening a PDF document are available on the courts website under CM/ECF Instructions to flatten PDF files. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE FLATTENED DOCUMENT IMMEDIATELY. Related [+] (SCX)
Related: [-] 15 Notice of Change of Address filed by Debtor Yihe Forbes LLC
15 15 misc Notice of Change of Address Wed 04/09 2:19 PM
Notice of Change of Address Brooks and DeRemsis Filed by Debtor Yihe Forbes LLC. (Baum, Richard)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Notice of Change of Address Wed 04/09 2:18 PM
Notice of Change of Address County of Suffolk Filed by Debtor Yihe Forbes LLC. (Baum, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
13 13 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Tue 04/08 12:10 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Other -PDF document was not flattened prior to filing. Instructions for flattening a PDF document are available on the courts website under CM/ECF Instructions to flatten PDF files. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE FLATTENED DOCUMENT IMMEDIATELY. Other - Proof of service required. Related [+] (SCX)
Related: [-] 11 Notice of Change of Address filed by Debtor Yihe Forbes LLC
12 12 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Tue 04/08 11:30 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Incorrect/incomplete/unreadable PDF was attached to the docket entry - All PDF files must be flattened before filing through CM/ECF. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE CORRECT PDF IMMEDIATELY. Other - Proof of service required. Related [+] (SM)
Related: [-] 10 Notice of Change of Address filed by Debtor Yihe Forbes LLC
11 11 misc Notice of Change of Address Tue 04/08 10:18 AM
Notice of Change of Address Brooks and DeRensis Filed by Debtor Yihe Forbes LLC. (Baum, Richard)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Notice of Change of Address Tue 04/08 10:15 AM
Notice of Change of Address of County of Suffolk Filed by Debtor Yihe Forbes LLC. (Baum, Richard)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice Tue 04/08 9:59 AM
Notice of Continuance of Principal Status Conference Filed by Debtor Yihe Forbes LLC Related [+]. (Baum, Richard)
Related: [-] 2 Procedure Order....Principal status conference: May 6, 2025 at 1:00 p.m. (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #1 ) Signed on 4/4/2025 (SS),8 Order Continuing Principal Status Conference (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc #5 ) Signed on 4/7/2025 (DG)
Monday, April 07, 2025
8 8 order X - Application (Generic) (RE: Application) (BNC-PDF) Mon 04/07 2:07 PM
Order Continuing Principal Status Conference (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/7/2025 (DG)
Related: [-] 5
Sunday, April 06, 2025
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 04/06 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/06/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 04/06 9:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 12. Notice Date 04/06/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1)
Saturday, April 05, 2025
5 5 motion X - Application (Generic) (motion) Sat 04/05 9:03 AM
Application to Continue Principal Status Conference Filed by Debtor Yihe Forbes LLC (Baum, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
4 4 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1) Fri 04/04 2:06 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/9/2025 at 10:30 AM at UST-LA2, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-816-0394, PARTICIPANT CODE:5282999. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 7/8/2025. (LL2)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Hearing Set (Other) (BK Case - BNC Option) Fri 04/04 2:03 PM
Hearing Set Status hearing to be held on 5/6/2025 at 01:00 PM at Crtrm 1545, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. Related [+] The case judge is Neil W. Bason (SS)
Related: [-] lated to docket entry1
2 2 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 04/04 2:02 PM
Procedure Order....Principal status conference: May 6, 2025 at 1:00 p.m. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/4/2025 (SS)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, April 03, 2025
1 1 33 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 04/03 4:15 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Yihe Forbes LLC (Baum, Richard)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 04/03 4:15 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:2:25-bk-12772] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58246097. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1