Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Mark A Goldsmith
Referred: David R Grand
Case #: 2:25-cv-10571
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 12, 2025 8:11 AM EDT
Defendant
Washtenaw County Trial Court
Plaintiff
Daniel Ryan McGough
P.O. Box 970081
Ypsilanti, MI 48197


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, April 17, 2025
9 9 order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge* Thu 04/17 2:03 PM
ORDER Referring Matters for Full Pretrial to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (JOwe)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Directing Service by the US Marshal Thu 04/17 2:02 PM
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Complete Service Documents and for Service of Process by the US Marshal. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (JOwe)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Thu 04/17 2:00 PM
ORDER granting5 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (JOwe)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Thu 04/17 2:05 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re8 Directing Service by the US Marshal,7 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs,9 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge on Daniel Ryan McGough at P.O. Box 970081, Ypsilanti, MI 48197 (JOwe)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
6 6 order Reassignment/Disqualification Thu 04/03 4:42 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Shalina D. Kumar and Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman in Flint to District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith and Magistrate Judge David R. Grand in Detroit. (NAhm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
5 5 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Daniel Ryan McGough. [SUBMITTED THROUGH PRO SE PORTAL] (NAhm)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
4 4 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (THum)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
2 2 Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. Correction due by 3/14/2025 (JHea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT [PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS] filed by Daniel Ryan McGough against Washtenaw County Trial Court. [Pro Se Document Upload] (JHea)
Related: [-]